Thermolife International, LLC v. SNAC System, Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Janis L Sammartino |
Referred: | Mitchell D Dembin |
Case #: | 3:13-cv-00825 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2013 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 07, 2015 2:44 PM PST |
Counter Claimant
SNAC System, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Thermolife International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SNAC System, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thermolife International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2013 4:36 PM PDT |
Friday, April 05, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Snac System, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0974-5778365) filed by Thermolife International, LLC. The new case number is 3:13-cv-825-WQH-BGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Woods, Tyler) [Notified CA of Related Case Notice] (kcm)(av1). | |
Att: 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *6,646,006*, *6,117,872*, *5,891,459*, *7,452,916* cc:USPTO (kcm) (av1). | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (kcm) (av1). | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Thermolife International, LLC of case(s) 13cv650 13cv651 13cv652 13cv653 (mdc) Modified on 4/9/2013 - Proposed Low Number Order was prepared; lower-numbered case: 13cv650 JLS-MDD. (mdc) |