USA v. Southwest Gaming Services of Louisiana et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Foote |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 5:13-cv-00732 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2013 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 07, 2015 4:13 PM CST |
Counter Claimant
Richard D Pernici
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
USA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Midsouth Bank N A
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Southwest Gaming Services of Louisiana
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark A Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
River Cities Gaming Corp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LA Dept of Revenue
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard D Pernici
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MidSouth Bancorp Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ronald J Miciotto
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carl Doyle LeCroy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J M J J Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Cypress Gaming Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Airline Car Rental Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Southwest Gaming Services Inc
Terminated: 12/02/2013
|
|
Defendant
Capstone Gaming L L C
Terminated: 11/04/2013
|