Tucker v. Jefferson Operator, LLC et al
Tennessee Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Curtis L Collier |
Referred: | H Bruce Guyton |
Case #: | 3:13-cv-00200 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993 |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2013 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 07, 2015 5:21 AM EST |
Defendant
William D. Gray, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jefferson Operator, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Northpoint Senior Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cloie Tucker
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 16 2013
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Quash and 26 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 12/16/2013. (KMK, ) |