Automated Transactions LLC v. Community Bank of Bergen County
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Sue L Robinson |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-00588 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2013 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2013 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 07, 2015 2:34 AM EST |
Defendant
Community Bank of Bergen County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Automated Transactions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2013 5:51 PM EDT |
Friday, February 15, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against COMMUNITY BANK OF BERGEN COUNTY ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4833772) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AUTOMATED TRANSACTIONS LLC.(dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/16/2013.] | |
Att: 1 exh a, | ||
Att: 2 exh b, | ||
Att: 3 exh c, | ||
Att: 4 exh d, | ||
Att: 5 exh e, | ||
Att: 6 exh f, | ||
Att: 7 exh g, | ||
Att: 8 exh h, | ||
Att: 9 exh i, | ||
Att: 10 exh j, | ||
Att: 11 exh k, | ||
Att: 12 exh l, | ||
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 14 attachment to civ cov | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTOMATED TRANSACTIONS LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/16/2013.] | |
Thursday, February 21, 2013 | ||
SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMUNITY BANK OF BERGEN COUNTY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Dianne C. Richards* (dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/16/2013.] | ||
Monday, April 15, 2013 | ||
4 | 4 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Delaware. (jl, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/16/2013.] | |
Tuesday, April 16, 2013 | ||
NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (mdb) | ||
5 | 5 Record of case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number in Other District: 2:13-cv-00968. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file | |
6 | 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:13-md-2429 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (mdb) |