Harper et al v. Microf, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-00043
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-00043
Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Tamara O Mitchell |
Case #: | 2:16-ap-00066 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 11, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Microf, LLC
1708 Gillionville Road
Albany, GA 31708 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Lamar Harper
92 Monterey Court
Pleasant Grove, AL 35127 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvette Patterson Harper
92 Monterey Court
Pleasant Grove, AL 35127 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
D. Sims Crawford
Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P O Box 10848
Birmingham, AL 35202 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
court
Return Mail
Tue 08/23 1:11 PM
Return Mail - Microf, LLC (klt) |
|
Saturday, August 13, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sun 08/14 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice . Notice Date 08/13/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Approve Compromise
Thu 08/11 2:40 PM
Notice and Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Signed on 8/11/2016. (klt) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Approve Compromise - Motion
Thu 08/11 10:41 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise Proposed Notice and Order submitted to OrdersTOM@alnb.uscourts.gov Filed by Plaintiffs Frederick Lamar Harper, Yvette Patterson Harper (Botes, Bradford) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 08/11 2:41 PM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-66 Closed (klt) |
||
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 07/12 12:06 PM
Notice of Change of Address for Microf, LLC Filed by Plaintiffs Frederick Lamar Harper, Yvette Patterson Harper. (Botes, Bradford) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/05 3:18 PM
Certificate of Service Complaint by Frederick Lamar Harper, Yvette Patterson Harper against Microf, LLC. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Yvette Patterson Harper, Plaintiff Frederick Lamar Harper,2 Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/17/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt)). (Botes, Bradford) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 07/01 7:47 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/17/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/30 6:05 PM
Adversary case 16-00066 14 ) Complaint by Frederick Lamar Harper, Yvette Patterson Harper against Microf, LLC. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (Botes, Bradford) |