Road Sprinkler Fitters Local Union No. 669, U.A., AFL-CIO v. CCR Fire Protection, LLC et al
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John W Degravelles |
Referred: | Erin Wilder-Doomes |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00448 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts) |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2016 3:45 AM CST |
Defendant
Earl Barnett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rajendra Bhakta
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CCR Fire Protection, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Nilesh Patel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quick Response Fire Protection
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Roseal Rodriguez, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theresa Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Road Sprinkler Fitters Local Union No. 669, U.A., AFL-CIO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
253 | 253
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 12/02 9:32 AM
ORDER of USCA granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 filed by Appellant Road Sprinkler Fitters Local Union No. 669, U.A. AFL-CIO. (KAH) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
252 | 252
appeal
Notice to Counsel of EROA
Tue 11/26 8:16 AM
Electronic Access to the Record on Appeal is now available through the Court of Appeals CM/ECF document filing system. Instructions for accessing the record can be found at[LINK:www.ca5.uscourts.gov/attorneys/attorney-forms/eroa_downloads] . Request for paper exhibits in addition to the record on appeal and shipping information should be faxed to the clerks office at 225-389-3501. The clerk of court will retain the responsibility of sending the record to the 5th Circuit upon their request. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) |
|
appeal
Appeal Record Electronically Certified
Tue 11/26 8:14 AM
Record on Appeal 19-30886 electronically Certified regarding247 Notice of Appeal to the USCA for the 5th Circuit. US Court of Appeals notified of certification. (SWE) |