Paul v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Steven E Rau |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-02313 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2016 2:58 AM CST |
Defendant
Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gyna Paul
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Thu 11/10 11:27 AM
JUDGMENT(kt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 11/09 11:36 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/9/2016. (BJS) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 11/07 5:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Gyna Paul. Jointly Signed by Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Thu 10/27 4:25 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gyna Paul regarding settlement reached . (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing/Deadline
Tue 09/27 11:03 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing:7 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2016 02:30 PM has been RESCHEDULED TO 11/7/2016 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 348 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Confidential settlement letters and the Rule 26(f) Report and worksheet must be submitted on or before 10/31/2016.(MME) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Mon 09/26 9:14 AM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gyna Paul . (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/14 3:05 PM
ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2016 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 348 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau). Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/14/16.(AKL) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/30 3:00 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Sun Life Financial Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Wagener, Terrance) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/30 2:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Wagener, Terrance) |
|
Saturday, July 09, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Sat 07/09 2:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gyna Paul. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada waiver sent on 7/1/2016, answer due 8/30/2016. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/01 4:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (TSS) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 07/01 4:51 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 16-cv-2313 (DWF/SER). (TSS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/01 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5003871.) Filed by Gyna Paul. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |