Business Aircraft Leasing, Inc. v. Brian Carn Ministries, Inc. et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Joe Brown |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01577 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 27, 2016 2:31 AM CST |
Defendant
Apollo Flight Training & Aircraft Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Carn Ministries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Carastro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Carn
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City Jet, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Martin Kofi Danso
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ronald E. Mays
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miracle Arena for All Nations
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Business Aircraft Leasing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
89 | 89
misc
Entry of Judgment
Wed 06/20 4:39 PM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:88 Order Dismissing Case. (jw) |
|
88 | 88
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/20 4:39 PM
ORDER: This action is DISMISSED, with prejudice, as to Defendants Brian Carn Ministries, Inc., Brian Carn, Ronald E. Mays, and City Jet, Inc. This Order shall constitute the final judgment as to these Defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. This action is DISMISSED, without prejudice, as to Defendants Martin Kofi Danso and Miracle Arena for All Nations. All pending motions are denied, as moot, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/20/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jw) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
87 | 87
misc
Proposed Order of Dismissal
Thu 06/14 10:26 AM
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BRIAN CARN MINISTRIES INC, BRIAN CARN, RON MAYS CITY JET INC AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO MARTIN KOFI DANSO AND MIRACLE ARENA FOR ALL NATIONS filed by Brian Carn Ministries, Inc., Brian Carn, Martin Kofi Danso, Miracle Arena for All Nations. (Andersen, Donald) |