UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CAPITOL SUPPLY INC
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Beryl A Howell |
Case #: | 1:13-mc-00373 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Motion to Enforce Subpoena |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2013 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2016 10:33 PM EST |
Petitioner
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
CAPITOL SUPPLY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 19 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the petitioner's 1 Petition for Summary Enforcement of Inspector General Subpoena. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 19, 2014.(lcbah2) |