Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Melvin S Hoffman
Case #: 1:16-bk-12574
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Sep 13, 2016
Claims Deadline:Nov 09, 2016

Debtor
Boston Grand Prix, LLC
425 Summer St
Boston, MA 02210-1719
Represented By
Michael J. Goldberg
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
A. Davis Whitesell
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109
Trustee
Gary W. Cruickshank
Law Office of Gary W.Cruickshank 21 Custom House Street Suite 920
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Charles R. Bennett, Jr.
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info
Gary W. Cruickshank
contact info

Docket last updated: 08/12/2016 6:00 AM EDT
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-12574 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 15633806, amount $ 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Meeting of Creditors is scheduled on 08/11/2016 at 09:00 AM at Room 325-B, U.S. Trustee Office, J.W. McCormack Post Office & Court House. (Goldberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals All Schedules and Statements and Matrix. Filing Fee in the Amount of $335 Filed by Boston Grand Prix, LLC. (Goldberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Debtor Boston Grand Prix, LLC (Goldberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Michael J. Goldberg in the amount of $75000. Plus $335 paid to debtor`s counsel for court filing fees filed by Debtor Boston Grand Prix, LLC (Goldberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 Certificate of Vote filed by Debtor Boston Grand Prix, LLC (Goldberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 Expedited Motion filed by Debtor Boston Grand Prix, LLC For Order (A) Excusing the Debtor From Completing The Master Mailing Matrix (Creditor Matrix) As To Creditors For Whom The Debtor Has Only E-Mail Addresses, And (B) Authorizing the Chapter 7 Trustee Or Other Estate Representative to Provide Notice of This Chapter 7 Case To Such Creditors By E-Mail with certificate of service. (Goldberg, Michael)
Related: [-]