California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:16-cv-01236
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2016
Terminated:Mar 31, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2016 1:30 AM PST
Defendant
Bossland GMBH
Represented By
Nicholas J Hoffman
Yukevich Cavanaugh
contact info
Anthony G Matricciani
Law Office Of Anthony G Matricciani
contact info
Steven S Vahidi
Yukevich Cavanaugh
contact info
Steven D Smelser
Yukevich Cavanaugh
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Marc Ellis Mayer
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Daniel A Kohler
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Karin G Pagnanelli
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Emily F Evitt
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/21/2017 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 31, 2017
36 36 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Fri 11:46 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 judgment
35 35 judgmentCV Judgment Fri 11:27 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge David O. Carter, in favor of Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. against Bossland GMBH. Judgment is entered in the sum of $8,740.235.41. See Judgment for more information. Related to: Order on Motion for Default Judgment34 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Default Judgment Fri 11:21 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: granting31 MOTION for Default Judgment. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
33 33 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Mon 8:21 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against defendant Bossland GMBH31 filed by Defendant Bossland GMBH. (Matricciani, Anthony)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 12:52 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Amended Proposed] Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against defendant Bossland GMBH31(Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 13, 2017
31 31 motion Default Judgment Mon 5:11 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against defendant Bossland GMBH filed by plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/10/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Marc E. Mayer,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-8 to Mayer Decl,
Att: 3 Declaration of Clint Rice,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 16, 2017
30 30 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Thu 11:02 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Bossland GMBH (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
29 29 respm Motion Related Document Wed 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify For Immediate Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals24 filed by Defendant Bossland GMBH. (Matricciani, Anthony)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Clerk to Enter Default Wed 9:38 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Bossland GMBH filed by plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Marc E. Mayer
Friday, February 10, 2017
27 27 order Extension of Time to File Fri 8:45 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT25 by Judge David O. Carter: The Court DENIES the Application. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(4), the Defendant's answer was due on February 8, 2017. Thus, its answer is already late. Bossland shall file an answer within twenty-four hours of the issuance of this order. *Refer to Order for further details.* (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
26 26 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Wed 2:13 PM
OPPOSITION in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT25 filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 5:02 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Bossland GMBH. (Hoffman, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Nicholas J. Hoffman,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
24 24 motion Certify Tue 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify For Immediate Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Bossland GMBH. Motion set for hearing on 3/13/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Hoffman, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
23 23 order Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 9:19 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter denying16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (see document for details). (dro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
22 22 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 9:32 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 16 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 1/9/2017 is removed from the calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2016
21 21 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 7:04 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 16 Reply filed by Defendant Bossland GMBH.(Matricciani, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Letschew,
Att: 2 Declaration of Onken
Monday, December 12, 2016
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 5:19 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 16 filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of James Berkley,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-15 to Berkley Decl,
Att: 3 Exhibit 16-26 to Berkley Decl,
Att: 4 Exhibit 27-38 to Berkley Decl,
Att: 5 Exhibit 39-47 to Berkley Decl,
Att: 6 Exhibit 48-62 to Berkley Decl,
Att: 7 Exhibit 63-78 to Berkley Decl,
Att: 8 Exhibit 79-90 to Berkley Decl,
Att: 9 Declaration of Clint Rice,
Att: 10 Declaration of Matthias Werner,
Att: 11 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Zwetan Letschew
Tuesday, November 29, 2016
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 7:25 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony G Matricciani counsel for Defendant Bossland GMBH. Adding Anthony G. Matricciani as counsel of record for Bossland GmbH for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Bossland GmbH. (Attorney Anthony G Matricciani added to party Bossland GMBH(pty:dft))(Matricciani, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
18 18 notice Appearance Wed 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicholas J Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Bossland GMBH (Attorney Nicholas J Hoffman added to party Bossland GMBH(pty:dft))(Hoffman, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2016
17 17 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 7:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bossland GMBH, (Smelser, Steven)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 7:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Bossland GMBH. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Smelser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Letschew,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, November 14, 2016
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) Mon 12:59 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., upon Defendant Bossland GMBH served on 10/6/2016, answer due 11/18/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2016
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 12:50 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bossland GMBH answer now due 11/18/2016, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Bossland GMBH.(Attorney Steven D Smelser added to party Bossland GMBH(pty:dft))(Smelser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2016
13 13 order Order Fri 1:20 PM
ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution11 by Judge David O. Carter: On October 5, 2016, the Court issued an Order To Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed For Lack Of Prosecution (ECF No. 11). On October 11, 2016, Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Plaintiff) filed a Response thereto (ECF No. 12).The Court hereby deems Plaintiffs Response satisfactory and DISCHARGES the Order To Show Cause. The Court further ORDERS that on or before November 23, 2016, Plaintiff shall either file a proof of service of its Summons and Complaint or a status report (lwag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
12 12 misc Reply Tue 4:36 PM
REPLY filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,11 (Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 05, 2016
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 11:39 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed For Lack of Prosecution by Judge David O. Carter: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff (s) to showcause in writing no later than October 12, 2016 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. See document for further information. (lwag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2016
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 8:58 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10:19 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Bossland GMBH. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 9:18 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Tue 8:17 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:16-cv-01236-DOC (KESx). (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2016
5 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
4 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., identifying Activision Blizzard, Inc., a publicly traded company, is the ultimate parent of plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18123648 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attorney Marc Ellis Mayer added to party Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mayer, Marc)
Related: [-]