Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. v. M.V. SKAGEN MAERSK et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Loretta A Preska |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-05382 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 46:30701 Marine Cargo Loss or Damage - Liability of Water Carriers |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 03, 2017 5:01 AM EST |
Defendant
A.P. Moller-Maersk A/S t/a Maersk Sealand
|
|
Defendant
A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M.V. Cap San Nicolas
|
|
Defendant
M.V. Lena
|
|
Defendant
M.V. Skagen Maersk
|
|
Defendant-in-Rem
M.V. CAP SAN NICOLAS
|
|
Defendant-in-Rem
M.V. LENA
|
|
Defendant-in-Rem
M.V. SKAGEN MAERSK
|
|
Plaintiff
Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.
399 Park Avenue 24th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 01/11 10:21 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STJPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and/or their respective counsels that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs to any party, against the defendants M.V. SKAGEN MAERSK; M.V. LENA and M.V. CAP SAN NICOLAS, their engines, boilers, etc. and A.P. MOLLER-MAERSK A/S trading as MAERSK LINE or trading as SEALAND pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed and all pending motions marked as moot. M.V. Lena (their engines, boilers, etc.), M.V. Skagen Maersk (their engines, boilers, etc.), A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S and M.V. Cap San Nicolas (their engines, boilers, etc.) terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/11/2017) (mro) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
misc
Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
Mon 01/09 8:40 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Manuel Molina for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 21 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (km) |
||
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/06 11:24 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) M.V. Cap San Nicolas, M.V. Lena, M.V. Skagen Maersk and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S.(Molina, Manuel) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Memo Endorsement
Tue 12/13 9:54 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:19 Letter filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed and all pending motions denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/13/2016) (mro) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Fri 12/09 4:58 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Carole Rouffet dated 12/09/2016 re: Notice of settlement. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co..(Rouffet, Carole) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 11/14 4:02 PM
ORDER granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/13/2016) (mro) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 11/10 4:46 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to finalize ongoing settlement discussions addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from James F. Sweeney, Esq. dated 11/10/2016. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co..(Sweeney, James) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Mon 11/14 11:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/1/2016. (mph) |
||
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 10/06 11:31 AM
ORDER OF CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel are directed to appear in courtroom 12A, or such other courtroom as may be designated, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007 on November 1, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. for an Initial Pretrial conference in the above action. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/1/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/5/2016) (kl) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 09/08 10:37 AM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S.(Molina, Manuel) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 09/08 10:35 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S.(Molina, Manuel) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/08 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yaakov U. Adler on behalf of A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S. (Adler, Yaakov) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/08 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Manuel Antonio Molina on behalf of A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S. (Molina, Manuel) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Wed 08/10 5:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S served on 8/8/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. Service was accepted by Mary Dekar. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. (Rouffet, Carole) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/12 2:53 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S. (pc) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/11 4:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S, M.V. Cap San Nicolas, M.V. Lena, M.V. Skagen Maersk.Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co..(Rouffet, Carole) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Fri 07/08 3:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Carole A.R. Rouffet to RE-FILE Document No. 7 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; PDF needs to indicate and have the caption title "Amended Complaint". Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) |
||
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 07/07 5:51 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A.P. MOLLER - MAERSK A/S trading as MAERSK LINE or trading as SEALAND, re:7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. (Rouffet, Carole) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 07/07 5:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending2 Amended Complaint, against A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S, M.V. Cap San Nicolas, M.V. Lena, M.V. Skagen Maersk.Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. Related document:2 Amended Complaint, filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co..(Rouffet, Carole) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 07/07 10:12 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Carole A.R. Rouffet. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. A.P. Moller-Maersk A/S t/a Maersk Sealand, M.V. CAP SAN NICOLAS, M.V. LENA, M.V. SKAGEN MAERSK.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 07/07 10:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Carole A.R. Rouffet. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $126,426,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $125,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Thu 07/07 10:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Carole A.R. Rouffet to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. PDF needs to indicate and have the caption title "Supplemental Amended Complaint" Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) Modified on 7/7/2016 (pc) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 07/07 10:35 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 07/07 10:36 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 07/07 10:36 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 07/07 10:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name listed on the summons must match exactly what is listed on the complaint caption title. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) |
||
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 07/06 5:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A.P. Moller - Maersk, re:1 Complaint,2 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. (Rouffet, Carole) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/06 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James F. Sweeney, III on behalf of Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. (Sweeney, James) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/06 5:39 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Starr Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Starr Global Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent Starr Global Holdings AG, Corporate Parent Starr International Company, Inc. for Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co..(Rouffet, Carole) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 07/06 5:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rouffet, Carole) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 07/06 5:05 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against A.P. Moller-Maersk A/S t/a Maersk Sealand, M.V. CAP SAN NICOLAS, M.V. LENA, M.V. SKAGEN MAERSK.Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co..(Rouffet, Carole) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/06 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against A.P. Moller-Maersk A/S t/a Maersk Sealand, M.V. CAP SAN NICOLAS, M.V. LENA, M.V. SKAGEN MAERSK. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12506128)Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co..(Rouffet, Carole) |