Ateistas de Puerto Rico, Inc. et al v. Puerto Rico Department of Education et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Jay A Garcia-Gregory |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-02319 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 03, 2017 5:16 AM AST |
Defendant
Arecibo School District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brenda Perez-Soto
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Puerto Rico Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rafael Roman-Melendez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gladys Sanchez-Santiago
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ateistas de Puerto Rico, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Rafael Solis-Corps
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronaldo Gilberto Torres-Maldonado
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/27 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago (Diaz-Rivera, Idza) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 12/09 6:21 PM
ORDER granting Attorney Melissa Massheder-Torres'36 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 12/9/2019. (JG) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Withdraw Attorney
Fri 12/06 3:31 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Melissa Massheder-Torres filed by Melissa Massheder-Torres on behalf of Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago Responses due by 12/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Massheder-Torres, Melissa) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order Staying Case ~Util - Case Stayed
Fri 08/10 7:58 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE: Pursuant to PROMESA this case is stayed. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/10/2018. (ALP) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion Submitting
Fri 07/20 6:07 PM
ORDER: NOTED33 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/20/2018. (ALP) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Submitting
Wed 01/10 6:19 PM
MOTION Submitting errata version of defendants' motion in compliance with ECF no. 24 re:24 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,29 Motion In Compliance as to24 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 26 Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Brenda Perez-Soto, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Arecibo School District, Rafael Roman-Melendez filed by Yadhira Ramirez-Toro on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 1/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) |
|
Att: 1 Errata defendants' motion in compliance with ECF no. 24 | ||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 01/02 4:27 PM
ORDER: GRANTING30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 1/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/2/2018. (ALP) |
|
Saturday, December 30, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Sat 12/30 11:08 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion IN COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER AT ECF NO. 24 filed by All Plaintiffs Re:29 Motion In Compliance as to24 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 26 Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Brenda Perez-Soto, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Arecibo School District, Rafael Roman-Melendez filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 12/29 7:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/12/2018 to File Response/Reply as to29 Motion In Compliance as to24 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 26 Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Brenda Perez-Soto, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Arecibo School District, Rafael Roman-Melendez filed by Miguel A. Rodriguez-Robles on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
In Compliance
Fri 12/15 11:00 AM
Motion In Compliance as to24 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 26 Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Melissa Massheder-Torres on behalf of Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago Responses due by 12/29/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Massheder-Torres, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 11/30 12:11 PM
ORDER: GRANTING27 Motion for extension of time. Brief due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/30/2017. (ALP) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 11/30 8:55 AM
MOTION for extension of time until December 15, 2017 to comply with the order of the Court entered at ECF no. 24. filed by Melissa Massheder-Torres on behalf of Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago Responses due by 12/14/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Massheder-Torres, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 10/26 11:51 AM
ORDER: GRANTING25 Motion for extension of time. Brief due by 11/30/2017. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/26/2017. (ALP) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 10/26 11:19 AM
MOTION for extension of time until November 30, 2017 to comply with the order of the Court entered at ECF no. 24. filed by Melissa Massheder-Torres on behalf of Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago Responses due by 11/9/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Massheder-Torres, Melissa) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/18 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Automatic Stay and Second Amended Notice, Case Management and Administrative Procedures by Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
24
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 10/16 3:04 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING in part and DENYING in part20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Specifically, 1) Ateistas's monetary claims under Section 1983 are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice as to all Defendants in their official capacity; 2) all other claims survive. Defendants are ORDERED to brief the issue of taxpayer standing. Brief due by 10/30/2017. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/15/2017. (ALP) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Tue 04/25 2:35 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/25/2017. (ALP) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 02/23 1:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B) filed by All Plaintiffs Re:20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brenda Perez-Soto, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Arecibo School District, Rafael Roman-Melendez filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 02/09 11:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Melissa Massheder-Torres on behalf of Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago Responses due by 2/23/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Massheder-Torres, ) |
|
19 | 19
motion
File Excess Pages
Thu 02/09 10:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Melissa Massheder-Torres on behalf of Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago Responses due by 2/23/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Massheder-Torres, ) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 02/02 8:16 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 2/9/2017. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/2/2017. (ALP) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 02/02 8:12 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/2/2017. (ALP) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 02/02 7:34 PM
Final MOTION for Extension of Time until February 9, 2017 to File Answer to the complaint or otherwise plead re:1 Complaint,, filed by Jose Rafael Solis-Corps, Ronaldo Gilberto Torres-Maldonado, Ateistas de Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Yadhira Ramirez-Toro on behalf of Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago Responses due by 2/16/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 01/04 7:24 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time until February 2, 2017 to File Answer to the complaint or otherwise plead re:1 Complaint,, filed by Jose Rafael Solis-Corps, Ronaldo Gilberto Torres-Maldonado, Ateistas de Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Yadhira Ramirez-Toro on behalf of Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago Responses due by 1/18/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 12/05 7:18 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for extension of time. Response due by 1/4/2017. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 12/5/2016. (ALP) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 12/05 6:47 PM
MOTION for extension of time until January 4, 2017 to file answer to the complaint or otherwise plead filed by Yadhira Ramirez-Toro on behalf of Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago Responses due by 12/19/2016. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 11/07 10:04 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 12/5/2016. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/7/2016. (ALP) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 11/04 5:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until December 5, 2016 to File Answer to the complaint or otherwise plead re:1 Complaint,, filed by Jose Rafael Solis-Corps, Ronaldo Gilberto Torres-Maldonado, Ateistas de Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Yadhira Ramirez-Toro on behalf of Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/21/2016 (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 10/26 7:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Rafael Roman-Melendez served on 10/19/2016, answer due 11/9/2016. (Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 10/26 7:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016. (Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 10/26 7:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Gladys Sanchez-Santiago served on 10/19/2016, answer due 11/9/2016. (Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 10/26 7:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016. (Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 10/26 7:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Puerto Rico Department of Education served on 10/19/2016, answer due 11/9/2016. (Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 10/26 7:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Brenda Perez-Soto served on 10/19/2016, answer due 11/9/2016. (Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 10/26 7:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Arecibo School District served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016. (Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/08 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Arecibo School District, Edgar Ortiz-Ahorrio, Brenda Perez-Soto, Puerto Rico Department of Education, Luis G. Rodriguez-Ramos, Rafael Roman-Melendez, Gladys Sanchez-Santiago (arg) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 07/08 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/07 1:45 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-4999708.), filed by Ronaldo Gilberto Torres-Maldonado, Jose Rafael Solis-Corps, Ateistas de Puerto Rico, Inc.. Service due by 11/7/2016,(Rodriguez-Robles, Miguel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet JS44, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Incorporation, | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit Image, | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit Image, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons |