Yarway Corporation
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:13-bk-11025 |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2013 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 24, 2013 |
Claims Deadline: | Mar 18, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Apr 08, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Yarway Corporation
1501 NW 51st St
Boca Raton, FL 33431-4438 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims Agent
Logan & Company Inc.
www.loganandco.com 546 Valley Road
Upper Montclair, NJ 07043 |
Represented By
|
Claims Agent
Logan & Company, Inc.
www.loganandco.com 546 Valley Road
Upper Montclair, NJ 07043 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago |