Chrisley Asset Management, LLC
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Grace Diehl |
Case #: | 1:13-bk-58781 |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2013 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 12, 2013 |
Converted: | Jul 23, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Chrisley Asset Management, LLC
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Interested Party
Julie Hughes Chrisley
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Michael Todd Chrisley
|
|
Interested Party
Key Asset Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Tamara Miles Ogier
Ogier, Rothschild & Rosenfeld PC 170 Mitchell St. S.W.
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
|
Trustee
Robert Trauner
P. O. Box 421025
Atlanta, GA 30342 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2013 8:52 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 3 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fee $ 1213, Filed by Mathew A. Schuh of Busch Slipakoff & Schuh on behalf of Chrisley Asset Management, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/20/2013. Disclosure Statement due by 8/20/2013. (Schuh, Mathew) | |
2 | 2 Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 13-58781 [misc,4002aty] (1213.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 31227028. Fee Amount 1213.00 (U.S. Treasury) |