Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Dean Whipple
Case #: 4:16-cv-00768
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1364 Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2016
Terminated:Jan 09, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2017 3:16 AM CST
Defendant
Heco, Inc.
Represented By
Lynn Weddle Judkins
Law Office Of Mcdonald & Bogdan
contact info
Michael P. Waddell
Law Office Of Mcdonald & Bogdan
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Fisher
Represented By
Lawrence D. Flick
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/16/2019 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, January 09, 2017
41 41 order Order of Dismissal Mon 4:51 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case as CLOSED. Signed on 1/9/2017 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 4:29 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal by Ashley Fisher. (Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2016
39 39 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 1:21 PM
NOTICE to take deposition of Plaintiff filed by Lynn Weddle Judkins on behalf of Defendant Heco, Inc..(Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2016
38 38 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 7:22 PM
Amended NOTICE to take deposition of HECO, Inc. /d/b/a Houston Excavating filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Fisher.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
37 37 trial Designation Wed 4:41 PM
DESIGNATION of HECO, Inc.'s Experts by Heco, Inc..(Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Keifer Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Keifer CV,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B Keifer Schedule,
Att: 4 Exhibit Krehbiel Report with Attachments 1-3 (CV & Schedule)
notice Notice of Hearing Cancellation Wed 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Telephone Conference scheduled for Wednesday, November 30, 2016, at 3:30 p.m. has been cancelled. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 24, 2016
36 36 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 9:33 PM
HECO, Inc.'s ANSWER to27 Amended Complaint on behalf of Heco, Inc..(Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
35 35 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 5:16 PM
NOTICE to take deposition of HECO, Inc., d/b/a Houston Excavating filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Fisher.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
34 34 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Pursuant to Local Rule 37.1, a Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference is rescheduled for WEDNESDAY, NOVEMBER 30, 2016, at 3:30 p.m., before Judge Dean Whipple. Plaintiffs counsel will coordinate the conference call. (Chambers Telephone Conference No: 816-512-5626. This number is to be used for conference calls only)(Willis, Kathy)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Cancellation Tue 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Telephone Conference scheduled for Tuesday, November 22, 2016 at 1:30 pm has been cancelled until further notice. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2016
33 33 discov Certificate of Service Mon 7:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heco, Inc. for Supplemental Replies to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents and Documents, bates-labeled HECO000090-442 (hand-delivered) filed by Lynn Weddle Judkins on behalf of Defendant Heco, Inc..(Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
32 32 discov Certificate of Service Mon 11:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heco, Inc. 's Reply Memorandum regarding Discovery Dispute Teleconference filed by Lynn Weddle Judkins on behalf of Defendant Heco, Inc..(Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2016
31 31 notice Notice of Filing Thu 8:43 PM
NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Memorandum for Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference by Ashley Fisher(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Requests for Production and Defendant's Responses
Wednesday, November 16, 2016
30 30 adr Designation of Mediator Wed 4:35 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jerry Palmer(Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Pursuant to Local Rule 37.1, a Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference is scheduled for TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 22, 2016, at 1:30 p.m., before Judge Dean Whipple. Plaintiffs counsel will coordinate the conference call. By 9:00 a.m. on FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 18, 2016, the parties shall each FILE a memorandum (under Notice of Filing Event), not exceeding three pages, describing the issues and arguments to be addressed during the conference call. Plaintiffs counsel shall attach to the memorandum a copy of any disputed discovery materials, including answers and objections. (Chambers Telephone Conference No: 816-512-5626. This number is to be used for conference calls only.)(Willis, Kathy)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2016
28 28 discov Certificate of Service Fri 3:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Fisher of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Fisher.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2016
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 9:55 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Heco, Inc. filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Ashley Fisher.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
26 26 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 4:54 PM
ORDER Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint (Doc.22 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 22-1) within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed on 11/09/2016 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2016
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Mon 3:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heco, Inc. filed by Lynn Weddle Judkins on behalf of Defendant Heco, Inc..(Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2016
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Mon 5:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Fisher Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Fisher.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Expert Report of David L. Dorrity,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Qualifications and Publications of David L. Dorrity,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Case List of David L. Dorrity
Friday, October 21, 2016
23 23 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Fri 6:06 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re22 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Fisher. Related [+] (Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 motion Amend/Correct Fri 6:05 PM
MOTION to amend/correct Complaint filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Ashley Fisher. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/7/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint
Monday, October 10, 2016
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Mon 8:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heco, Inc. 's Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories & Requests for Production of Documents filed by Lynn Weddle Judkins on behalf of Defendant Heco, Inc..(Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
20 20 discov Certificate of Service Tue 4:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Fisher of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Disclosures filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Fisher.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Fri 5:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heco, Inc. for Answers & Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admission filed by Lynn Weddle Judkins on behalf of Defendant Heco, Inc..(Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
18 18 order Scheduling Order Wed 1:32 PM
SCHEDULING and TRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 12/30/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 1/27/2017. Jury Trial set for 6/26/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8B, Kansas City, before District Judge Dean Whipple. Signed on 09/28/2016 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 pretrial template
Monday, September 12, 2016
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Mon 9:00 PM
NOTICE of filing Certificate of Service for HECO, Inc.'s Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures to Plaintiff by Heco, Inc. (Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Mon 8:58 PM
NOTICE of filing Entry of Appearance by Lynn Weddle Judkins as additional counsel by Heco, Inc. (Judkins, Lynn)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Mon 2:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Fisher.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
14 14 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 4:50 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and DISCOVERY PLAN by Ashley Fisher. (Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2016
12 12 discov Certificate of Service Thu 11:11 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Fisher of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Fisher.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 1:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Heco, Inc.(Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 4:33 PM
ORDER - The Motion of Defendant to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses Out of Time (Doc.6 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Defendants Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Doc. 6-1) as of the date of this Order. Signed on 08/31/2016 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Wed 9:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Fisher of Service of Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Defendant filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Fisher.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
9 9 discov Certificate of Service Tue 11:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Fisher of Service of Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions to Defendant filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Fisher.(Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2016
8 8 notice Notice of MAPN Mon 1:49 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Martin, Jan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
7 7 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 4:17 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Ashley Fisher. Ashley Fisher served on 7/12/2016, answer due 8/2/2016. (Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 3:20 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Michael P. Waddell on behalf of Heco, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/29/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Waddell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Filed stamped copy of Answer
5 5 order Rule 16 Notice Fri 10:23 AM
Rule 16 Notice. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/12/2016. Signed on 08/12/2016 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Fri 8:11 AM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael P. Waddell on behalf of Defendant Heco, Inc..(Waddell, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 8:07 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint on behalf of Heco, Inc..(Attorney Michael P. Waddell added to party Heco, Inc.(pty:dft))(Waddell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2016
2 2 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Mon 11:20 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Ashley Fisher. Heco, Inc. served on 7/12/2016, answer due 8/2/2016. (Flick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 8:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Heco, Inc. filed by Lawrence D. Flick on behalf of Ashley Fisher. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-4900255. Service due by 10/11/2016.(Travis, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued Mon 8:58 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Heco, Inc.. (Travis, Kendra)
Related: [-]