KINDERCARE EDUCATION LLC v. CINTAS CORPORATION et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Mark Falk |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-04211 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Oct 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 08, 2017 3:59 AM EST |
Cross Claimant
NEW JERSEY FIRE EQUIPMENT
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
AC MARMO & SONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
CINTAS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
MICHAEL MARMO
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
NEW JERSEY FIRE EQUIPMENT
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-5
|
|
Cross Defendant
CINTAS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
AC Marmo & Sons, Inc.
350 Passaic Avenue Fairfield
Fairfield, NJ 07015 |
|
Cross Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
|
|
Cross Defendant
Michael Marmo
44 Coventry Way
Ringwood, NJ 07456 |
|
Defendant
NEW JERSEY FIRE EQUIPMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-5
|
|
Defendant
CINTAS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
|
|
Notice Only
PHV JEFFREY SEFTON
|
|
Plaintiff
KINDERCARE EDUCATION LLC
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
NEW JERSEY FIRE EQUIPMENT
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Defendant
KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Terminated: 12/16/2016
2221 Edward Holland Drive Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23230 |
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Terminated: 12/16/2016
2221 Edward Holland Drive Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23230 |
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
MICHAEL MARMO
Terminated: 12/13/2016
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
AC MARMO & SONS, INC.
Terminated: 12/13/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
128 | 128
order
Stipulation and Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines
Wed 07/10 12:57 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice re127 Stipulation. etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 7/10/2019. (dam, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
127 | 127
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/09 3:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by KINDERCARE EDUCATION LLC. (YOUNG, DANIEL) |