Schaaf-Richards v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-03922 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 09, 2017 12:59 AM PST |
Defendant
Volkswagen A.G.
A German Corporation 2200 Ferdinand Porsche Drive
Herndon, VA 20171 |
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Schaaf-Richards
|
Represented By
|
Transfering Court
Michelle Schaaf-Richards
|
Represented By
|
Transfering Court
Volkswagen A.G.
A German Corporation 2200 Ferdinand Porsche Drive
Herndon, VA 20171 |
|
Transfering Court
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case Closed
Tue 08/04 12:33 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Court's order of 7/21/2020 in the MDL 3:15-md-02672-CRB master file (dkt. #7629), civil case no. 3:16-cv-3922 is terminated. cc: JPMDL (arkS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Transcript
Mon 11/07 9:29 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/03/2016, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 11/7/2016) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 07/13 1:43 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:16-cv-01710. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) | ||
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (47) transferring case to Northern District of California to be included in MDL Docket No. 2672. (lgouadi, 4) | |
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER that this case is stayed pending the MDL transfer and administratively closed, Case terminated on June 23, 2016.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) | |
4 | 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Stay.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) | |
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION to Stay by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/13/2016.(Hartline, C) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) | |
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 165th District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2016-29976 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-16801353) filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Hartline, C) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet - Attachment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Index - State Court Docs, | ||
Att: 4 Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Plf's Original Petition, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Case Information Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Citation and Service of Process, | ||
Att: 8 VWGoA's Original Answer |