NobelBiz, Inc. v. LiveVox Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 3:13-cv-01773 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2013 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 06, 2015 2:50 PM PST |
Defendant
LiveVox Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NobelBiz, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2013 2:04 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 03, 2012 | ||
Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, ) | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against LiveVox Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3526133.), filed by NobelBiz, Inc..(Capshaw, Sidney) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Capshaw, Sidney) | |
3 | 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NobelBiz, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney) | |
Wednesday, April 04, 2012 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS Issued as to LiveVox Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) | |
Thursday, April 05, 2012 | ||
5 | 5 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Preliminary Injunction-Related Papers by NobelBiz, Inc..(Capshaw, Sidney) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NobelBiz, Inc..(Capshaw, Sidney) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - '122 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Chevalier, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - 02/22/10 Correspondence, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - 02/22/10 Correspondence, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - 03/10/09 Correspondence, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - Web Site Print Out, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - Web Site Print Out, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 - 03/20/12 Correspondence, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 - 03/20/12 Correspondence, | ||
Att: 10 Affidavit Siminoff, | ||
Att: 11 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 10, 2012 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER granting5 Motion to Seal Preliminary Injunction-Related Papers. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/09/12. cc:attys 4-10-12 (mll, ) | |
Monday, April 16, 2012 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Harkins, Jr on behalf of LiveVox Inc. (Harkins, Robert) | |
Wednesday, April 18, 2012 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert M Harkins, Jr (Harkins, Robert) | |
Monday, April 23, 2012 | ||
10 | 10 Return of Service Executed as to LiveVox Inc. on 4/4/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/25/2012. (mll, ) | |
Tuesday, April 24, 2012 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Paul Cauley, Jr on behalf of LiveVox Inc. (Cauley, E) | |
12 | 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LiveVox Inc..( Cauley, E) | |
13 | 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Favad Rauf Bajaria on behalf of LiveVox Inc. (Bajaria, Favad) | |
Thursday, April 26, 2012 | ||
14 | 14 Defendant's LiveVox's Unopposed First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Discovery( Harkins, Robert) Modified on 4/27/2012 (mll, ). Attached Proposed Order. (gsg, ). | |
Att: 2 (4/27/2012) Corrected Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 27, 2012 | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint12 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LiveVox Inc. to 5/25/2012. 25 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) | ||
Wednesday, May 16, 2012 | ||
15 | 15 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles H Chevalier for NobelBiz, Inc.. (pkb, ) | |
16 | 16 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ralph A Dengler for NobelBiz, Inc.. (pkb, ) | |
17 | 17 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William A Hector for NobelBiz, Inc.. (pkb, ) (mll, ). | |
Att: 1 (5/18/2012) Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, May 23, 2012 | ||
18 | 18 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 23 FOR CORRECTED FILING*** MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Stay Proceedings Regarding NobelBiz's Application for Preliminary Injunction by LiveVox Inc.. (Harkins, Robert) Modified on 5/25/2012 (gsg). | |
19 | 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re18 MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Stay Proceedings Regarding NobelBiz's Application for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Robert Harkins filed by LiveVox Inc. . (Harkins, Robert) | |
20 | 20 AFFIDAVIT in Support re18 MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Stay Proceedings Regarding NobelBiz's Application for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Michael Lelaris filed by LiveVox Inc. . (Harkins, Robert) | |
Thursday, May 24, 2012 | ||
21 | 21 AFFIDAVIT in Support re18 MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Stay Proceedings Regarding NobelBiz's Application for Preliminary Injunction Replacement for Document No. 19 filed by LiveVox Inc. . (Harkins, Robert) | |
22 | 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support re18 MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Stay Proceedings Regarding NobelBiz's Application for Preliminary Injunction Replacement for Document No. 20 filed by LiveVox Inc. . (Harkins, Robert) | |
23 | 23 MOTION to Change Venue This Motion replaces Document No. 18 (adding Cert of Conference) by LiveVox Inc..(Harkins, Robert) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 25, 2012 | ||
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Motion to Change Venue, entry 18. No certificate of conference. See entry23 for corrected filing.(gsg) | ||
24 | 24 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Pltf Application for Preliminary Injunction by LiveVox Inc..(Harkins, Robert) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re6 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LiveVox Inc..(Harkins, Robert) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Michael Reed, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Klint Carmickle, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Robert Harkins, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to R. Harkins, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B to R. Harkins, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C to R. Harkins, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D to R. Harkins, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E to R Harkins, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F to R Harkins, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G to R Harkins, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H to R Harkins, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit I to R. Harkins, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit J to R. Harkins, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit K to R. Harkins, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit L to R Harkins, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit M to R Harkins, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit N to R Harkins, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit O to R Harkins, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit P to R. Harkins, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Q to R Harkins, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit R to R Harkins, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit S to R. Harkins, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit T to R. Harkins, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit U to R. Harkins | ||
Tuesday, May 29, 2012 | ||
26 | 26 ORDER granting24 Motion to Seal. The response to plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction, declarations and exhibits thereto shall be treated as confidential under Local Patent Rule 2-2. The Clerk is hereby directed to seal the defendants response to plaintiffs motion for injunction and exhibits thereto. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/29/12. cc:attys 5-29-12 (mll, ) | |
Thursday, May 31, 2012 | ||
27 | 27 ANSWER to1 Complaint by LiveVox Inc..(Harkins, Robert) | |
Monday, June 04, 2012 | ||
28 | 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant LiveVox, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings Regarding Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction by NobelBiz, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 05, 2012 | ||
29 | 29 ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re6 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Replies due by 6/11/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/05/12. cc:attys 6-05-12 (mll, ) | |
Monday, June 11, 2012 | ||
30 | 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Change Venue This Motion replaces Document No. 18 (adding Cert of Conference) (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and to Stay Proceedings) filed by NobelBiz, Inc. .(DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Hector, | ||
Att: 12 Declaration of Pollum, | ||
Att: 13 Declaration of Rambin, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Rambin, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Rambin | ||
31 | 31 Additional Attachments to Main Document:30 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion to File Sealed Additional Attachment by NobelBiz, Inc..(Rambin, Daymon) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
33 | 33 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Seal Additional Attachment) by NobelBiz, Inc..(Rambin, Daymon) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
34 | 34 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of its Application for Preliminary Injunction by NobelBiz, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
35 | 35 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re6 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NobelBiz, Inc. .(DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Att: 1 Siminoff Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, June 12, 2012 | ||
36 | 36 ORDER granting32 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/12/12. cc:attys 6-12-12 (mll, ) | |
37 | 37 ORDER granting34 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/12/12. cc:attys 6-12-12 (mll, ) | |
38 | 38 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by NobelBiz, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 13, 2012 | ||
39 | 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re33 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Seal Additional Attachment) filed by LiveVox Inc. . (Harkins, Robert) (gsg, ). | |
Att: 1 (6/14/2012) Text of Proposed Order | ||
40 | 40 ***DUPLICATE PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Additional Attachments to Main Document:39 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Harkins, Robert) Modified on 6/14/2012 (gsg). | |
41 | 41 ORDER denying38 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. NobelBiz, Inc. may refile its Reply Brief in Support of its Application for Preliminary Injunction in compliance with the page limits rules within one business day, otherwise the Court will only consider the reply brief to the extent it complies with the rules. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/12. cc:attys 6-14-12 (mll, ) | |
Friday, June 15, 2012 | ||
42 | 42 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re6 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NobelBiz, Inc. .(DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Att: 1 Siminoff Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C | ||
Thursday, June 21, 2012 | ||
43 | 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Change Venue This Motion replaces Document No. 18 (adding Cert of Conference) filed by LiveVox Inc. . (Harkins, Robert) | |
Monday, June 25, 2012 | ||
44 | 44 MOTION to Seal Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction by LiveVox Inc..(Harkins, Robert) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
45 | 45 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re6 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LiveVox Inc..(Harkins, Robert) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Supplemental Harkins Declaration | ||
Tuesday, June 26, 2012 | ||
46 | 46 ORDER granting44 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/26/12. cc:attys 6-26-12 (mll, ) | |
Monday, July 02, 2012 | ||
47 | 47 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Change Venue This Motion replaces Document No. 18 (adding Cert of Conference) filed by NobelBiz, Inc. .(DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Att: 1 Hector Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Hector Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Hector Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Hector Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Hector Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Hector Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Hector Declaration, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to Hector Declaration, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 to Hector Declaration, | ||
Att: 10 Rambin Declaration | ||
Monday, August 27, 2012 | ||
48 | 48 ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time for Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/27/12. cc:attys 8-28-12 (mll, ) | |
Friday, September 28, 2012 | ||
49 | 49 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by NobelBiz, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 15, 2012 | ||
50 | 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re49 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by LiveVox Inc. .(Harkins, Robert) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Consolidate | ||
Monday, October 22, 2012 | ||
51 | 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re49 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Consolidate) filed by NobelBiz, Inc. . (DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Monday, October 29, 2012 | ||
52 | 52 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re49 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by LiveVox Inc. . (Harkins, Robert) | |
Thursday, November 01, 2012 | ||
53 | 53 NOTICE by NobelBiz, Inc. (Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Monday, December 03, 2012 | ||
54 | 54 ORDER granting33 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/03/12. cc:attys 12-03-12 (mll, ) | |
Tuesday, January 15, 2013 | ||
55 | 55 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, ) | |
Thursday, February 21, 2013 | ||
56 | 56 ORDER denying49 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by NobelBiz, Inc. Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2013 10:00 AM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/21/13. cc:attys 2-22-13(mll, ) | |
57 | 57 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/21/13. cc:attys 2-22-13(mll, ) | |
58 | 58 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/21/13. cc:attys 2-22-13(mll, ) | |
Tuesday, March 12, 2013 | ||
59 | 59 NOTICE by NobelBiz, Inc. (NobelBiz, Inc.'s Certificate of Interested Persons and/or Entities) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Thursday, March 14, 2013 | ||
60 | 60 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Friday, March 15, 2013 | ||
61 | 61 NOTICE by NobelBiz, Inc. Regarding Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan (DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Tuesday, March 19, 2013 | ||
62 | 62 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by NobelBiz, Inc. (Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) | |
Friday, March 22, 2013 | ||
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2013 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Tyler) before Judge Michael H. Schneider is hereby CANCELLED. A Scheduling Order will be entered in the case. (lgp, ) Modified on 3/22/2013 (lgp, ). | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2013 | ||
63 | 63 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion and Deadlines re6 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2013 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Tyler) before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/27/13. (mjc, ) | |
Thursday, March 28, 2013 | ||
This civil action will be transferred to the Northern District of California on or after 4 17-2013 per Local Rule CV-83(b). (mll, ) | ||
64 | 64 ORDER granting23 Motion to Change Venue. The Court ORDERS that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 03/28/13. cc:attys 3-28-13 (mll, ) | |
Thursday, April 18, 2013 | ||
Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, ) | ||
Friday, April 19, 2013 | ||
65 | 65 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:12-cv-00246. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. | |
66 | 66 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013) | |
67 | 67 CLERKS NOTICE: Advising Counsel of Receipt of Action From the Eastern District of Texas. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013) |