Minnesota District Court
Judge:Michael J Davis
Referred: Franklin L Noel
Case #: 0:16-cv-02409
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2016
Terminated:Apr 27, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 10, 2017 3:03 AM CST
Defendant
The Standard Insurance Company
900 Southwest Fifth Avenue
Portland, OR 97204
Represented By
Terrance J Wagener
Messerli & Kramer P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
John Soukup
Represented By
Michael T Freske
Fields Law Firm
contact info
Stephen J Fields
Fields Law Office, Ltd
contact info
Kristen S Gyolai
Fields Law Firm
contact info
Brandon Operana
Operana Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2018 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 27, 2017
17 17 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Thu 1:50 PM
JUDGMENT(ACH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
16 16 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 11:56 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/27/17. (KMW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 2:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by The Standard Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff John Soukup. (Wagener, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2017
14 14 order Order Tue 11:22 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT's REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO FILE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD CONVENTIONALLY, UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/6/17. (kt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
13 13 motion Application to File Conventionally Thu 9:24 AM
APPLICATION to File Conventionally the administrative record by The Standard Insurance Company. (Wagener, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney Mon 7:01 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Freske, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 6:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Kemmitt on behalf of John Soukup. (Kemmitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2016
10 10 notice Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney Fri 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Freske on behalf of John Soukup. (Freske, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 10:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions (non-disp) due 12/1/2016. Motions (disp) due by 3/1/2017. Ready for trial due by 5/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 9/26/16. (kt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2016
7 7 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 1:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/23/2016. (kt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2016
6 6 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 3:10 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by The Standard Insurance Company.(Wagener, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2016
5 5 order Order Thu 3:27 PM
NOTICE/ORDER of Initial Pretrial Conference: Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2016 09:15 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 8/11/16.(kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Friday, August 05, 2016
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 2:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by The Standard Insurance Company. (Wagener, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2016
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 12:00 PM
Summons Issued as to The Standard Insurance Company. (KMM)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Thu 11:59 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 16-cv-2409 MJD/FLN. (KMM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10:35 AM
COMPLAINT against The Standard Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5017314.) Filed by John Soukup. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit(s),
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet