Cyber Instruments Technology LLC v. Brooks Instrument LLC
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John J Tuchi |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02335 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 10, 2017 2:10 AM MST |
Defendant
Brooks Instrument LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cyber Instruments Technology LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Mon 10/24 10:32 AM
ORDER vacating the hearing set for Monday, October 24, 2016, on the Order to Show Cause. FURTHER ORDERED dismissing the claims in this matter with prejudice and dismissing the counterclaims in this matter without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/24/2016. (ATD) |
|
Saturday, October 22, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice (Other)
Sat 10/22 8:49 AM
NOTICE re: Notice of Plaintiff's Consent to Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice and Defendant's Counterclaims without Prejudice by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC . (Underhill, Albert) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 10/21 2:48 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Brooks's Position Regarding Dismissal of Claims With Prejudice and Counterclaims Without Prejudice by Brooks Instrument LLC re:36 Order, Set/Reset Hearings, Terminate Hearings,35 Notice (Other) . (Long, Brianna) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Thu 10/20 2:13 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for October 24, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. Instead, the Court will set a Show Cause Hearing for that same date and time October 24, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 505, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J. Tuchi. At this hearing the parties will show cause why the claims ought not be dismissed with prejudice and also why the counterclaims ought not be dismissed with without prejudice. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/20/16. (JAMA) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/19 4:52 PM
NOTICE re: Notice Regarding Assignment of the Patent by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC re:23 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Hadley, Lawrence) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/18 3:22 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Cyber Instruments Initial Disclosures by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC . (Hadley, Lawrence) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Mon 10/17 4:34 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Brooks Instrument LLC. (Long, Brianna) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Mon 10/17 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Brooks Instrument LLC. (Long, Brianna) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/30 11:24 AM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Tue 08/30 11:24 AM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175750 as to Darren W Collins. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/30 11:24 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Darren W Collins on behalf of Brooks Instrument LLC. (BAS) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/24 2:46 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/24 2:45 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jason W Cook on behalf of Brooks Instrument LLC. (BAS) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Wed 08/24 2:46 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175586 as to Jason W Cook. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/18 3:59 PM
Answer to Counterclaims ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC.(Hadley, Lawrence) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Mon 08/15 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Brooks Instrument LLC. (Long, Brianna) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/15 12:26 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Mon 08/15 12:25 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175184 as to Lawrence M Hadley. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/15 12:25 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lawrence M Hadley on behalf of Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (BAS) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 08/11 1:58 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. All parties are required to appear in person at the hearing. No extensions will be granted. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/11/16. (JAMA) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/09 11:14 AM
NOTICE re: of Withdrawal of New Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by Brooks Instrument LLC re:18 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint,19 Answer to Complaint . (Long, Brianna) |
|
21 | 21
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Tue 08/09 10:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading19 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header (REK) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Statement
Mon 08/08 7:01 PM
STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Brooks Instrument LLC. (Long, Brianna) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/08 6:58 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Brooks Instrument LLC.(Long, Brianna) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Mon 08/08 2:28 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Brooks Instrument LLC.(Long, Brianna) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Mon 08/08 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Lynn Long on behalf of Brooks Instrument LLC. (Long, Brianna) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/05 3:42 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying14 the Parties' Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead with leave to amend once the parties comply with LRCiv 7.2(b). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/5/16.(JAMA) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Wed 08/03 1:22 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on defendants. (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/3/16. (JAMA) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/03 9:15 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC.(Underhill, Albert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/02 1:01 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/02 1:00 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Marcus Rabinowitz on behalf of Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (BAS) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Tue 08/02 1:01 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX174673 as to Marcus Rabinowitz. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 07/29 4:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J. Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 16-2335 PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
10 | 10
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Fri 07/29 4:23 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Thu 07/21 1:39 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC: Declaration of Service re: Complaint upon Brooks Instrument L.L.C. on 7/18/2016. (Underhill, Albert) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Mon 07/18 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (Underhill, Albert) |
|
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/15 9:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Brooks Instrument LLC. (BAS) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 07/14 4:52 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (Underhill, Albert) |
|
5 | 5
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Thu 07/14 12:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (REK) |
|
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 07/14 12:35 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13173464. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z. Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-02335 PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 07/14 12:33 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (submitted by Albert Underhill) (REK) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/14 12:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (submitted by Albert Underhill) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/14 12:30 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-13173464 filed by Cyber Instruments Technology LLC. (submitted by Albert Underhill)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |