Maria Karla Terraza v. Safeway Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-03994 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 10, 2017 1:23 AM PST |
Defendant
Benefit Plans Committee Safeway Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Safeway Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Dennis M. Lorenz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Karla Terraza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
255 | 255
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice Regarding Location Change for Judge Jon S. Tigar
Wed 08/21 4:13 PM
CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019: Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) |
|
254 | 254
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice Regarding Location Change for Judge Jon S. Tigar
Wed 08/21 4:11 PM
CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019: Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) |