Young Yil Jo v. Six Unknown Name Agents
Original Case: 3:12-cv-01007
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-02940 |
Type | civil / us |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 26, 2016 3:37 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
SIX UNKNOWN NAME AGENTS, or Mr. President of the United States Barack Obama
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
YOUNG YIL JO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/26/2016 3:33 AM CDT |
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Young Yil Jo by 07/20/2016. Transcript information sheet due by 07/28/2016. Fee or IFP forms due on 07/28/2016 for Appellant Young Yil Jo [1] [6767287] 16-2940 (CAG) | |
2 | 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6767291] 16-2940 (CAG) |