ALFORD et al v. WALTON COUNTY
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Charles J Kahn, Jr |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00362 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 11, 2017 4:23 AM EST |
Defendant
WALTON COUNTY
|
Represented By
|
Objector
Walton County Sheriffs Office
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mr LIONEL D ALFORD, JR
20 Sandy Beach Road
Miramar Beach, FL 32550 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mrs. TAMMY NIX ALFORD
20 Sandy Beach Road
Miramar Beach, FL 32550 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LIONEL D ALFORD, JR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TAMMY ALFORD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
109 | 109
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 06/11 12:28 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Clerks received from chambers 2 DVD's titled:"Video June 14, 2016 Meeting of the Walton County Board of County Commissioners and "March 2016 Meeting Video". Both DVD's placed in envelope, labeled and filed in cabinet. (alb) |