PULLIAM v. PARKER et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul S Diamond |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-03837 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Sep 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 10, 2017 4:32 AM EST |
Defendant
JILLIAN JOHNSON
|
|
Defendant
REGINA TUCHINSKY
|
|
Defendant
KELLI PIERCE
|
|
Defendant
FREDRINA PARKER
|
|
Defendant
JAIME NELLAMS
|
|
Defendant
JUSTIN MONTGOMERY
|
|
Defendant
JASON MANGO
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS LITTLE
|
|
Defendant
DAWN LEE
|
|
Defendant
AVONTAA LEE
|
|
Defendant
DIANE KRUGER
|
|
Defendant
WILHELMINA L. JONES
|
|
Defendant
FRITZ HAVERSTICK
|
|
Defendant
MELINDA HALL
|
|
Defendant
JENNIFER GLANDEN
|
|
Defendant
KATRINA GILPIN
|
|
Defendant
CAITLYN DUNSTON
|
|
Defendant
ANGELINA DAGER
|
|
Defendant
KELLY CASPER
|
|
Defendant
CYTHIA CAROL
|
|
Defendant
ALYSSA BRUNO
|
|
Defendant
TONYA BRONSON
|
|
Defendant
JANEL AUSTIN
|
|
Defendant
MARY ABBOUD
|
|
Plaintiff
JANAYA T. PULLIAM
5233 LAUREN ST
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19144 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Thu 09/14 2:58 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF SEEKS NO RELIEF FROM THIS COURT. TO THE EXTENT THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION CONSTITUTES A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, IT FAILS BECAUSE PLAINTIFF PROVIDES NO BASIS FOR RECONSIDERATION AND BECAUSE THE MOTION IS TIME BARRED. THIS CASE REMAINS TERMINATED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/14/23.9/14/23 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE.(JL) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
motion
Order
Fri 08/25 9:40 AM
MOTION filed by JANAYA T. PULLIAM.(jaa, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
utility
Returned Mail
Tue 11/14 9:38 AM
Copy of Order dated 11/1/17 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to JANAYA PULLIAM for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (jl, ) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/02 9:31 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO.8 ) IS DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/1/17. 11/2/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(nl, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 07/25 10:15 AM
ORDER THAT THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/25/17. 7/25/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(nl, ) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 02/03 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by JANAYA T. PULLIAM(jl, ) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
utility
Returned Mail
Tue 12/06 8:45 AM
Copy of Order dated 11/7/16 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to JANAYA FULLAM for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (jl, ) |
||
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/07 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT against MARY ABBOUD, JANEL AUSTIN, TONYA BRONSON, ALYSSA BRUNO, CYTHIA CAROL, KELLY CASPER, ANGELINA DAGER, CAITLYN DUNSTON, KATRINA GILPIN, JENNIFER GLANDEN, MELINDA HALL, FRITZ HAVERSTICK, JILLIAN JOHNSON, WILHELMINA L. JONES, DIANE KRUGER, AVONTAA LEE, DAWN LEE, THOMAS LITTLE, JASON MANGO, JUSTIN MONTGOMERY, JAIME NELLAMS, FREDRINA PARKER, KELLI PIERCE, REGINA TUCHINSKY, filed by JANAYA T. PULLIAM., EXHIBITS(rf, ) |
|
Att: 1 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
5 | 5
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 11/07 3:52 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC. 3) IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT (DOC. 1-1) IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AS OUTLINED HEREIN. PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/4/16. 11/7/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(rf, ) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 10/03 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by JANAYA T. PULLIAM(jl, ) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Application/Petition
Thu 09/22 1:40 PM
APPLICATION by JANAYA T. PULLIAM TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. (jl, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Tue 07/19 10:47 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/19/16. 7/19/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(jl, ) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Application/Petition
Fri 07/15 4:31 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY JANAYA T. PULLIAM.(jmv, ) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment |