MEYER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Kevin Mcnulty |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-04279 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Jun 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 11, 2017 4:49 AM EST |
Defendant
MERCK & CO., INC.
|
|
Defendant
MERCK SHARP & DOHME
|
|
Defendant
N.V. ORGANON
|
|
Defendant
ORGANON USA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
SCHERING CORPORATION
|
|
Plaintiff
STACY MEYER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Stipulation and Order
Sun 10/27 9:50 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/24/19. (nic, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)
Wed 10/23 5:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to all Defendants by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION. (WINTERS, DANIEL) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
9
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 09/17 2:24 PM
ORDER, THAT the administrative termination deadline in the cases listed above is hereby extended and the parties shall file dismissals with prejudice in the cases listed above on or before November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/13/2019. (JB, ) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/13 3:11 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION. (GEIST, MELISSA) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
9
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/23 11:27 AM
ORDER, that the administrative termination deadline in the cases listed above is hereby extended and the parties shall tile dismissals with prejudice in the cases listed above on or before September 13, 2019.. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/23/2019. (JB, ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/22 6:35 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION. (GEIST, MELISSA) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
5
pgs
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Wed 04/17 10:36 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 90 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/17/2019. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/17/19. (nic, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Tue 01/22 9:37 AM
TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 5/20/2019 at 3:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/22/2019. (kd) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 01/22 9:35 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 1/18/2019. (kd) |
||
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Tue 01/15 12:55 PM
Letter from Melissa A. Geist, Esq. (GEIST, MELISSA) |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Thu 01/03 11:07 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Conference scheduled for 2:30 pm on 1/18/2019 is rescheduled to 12:30 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the line, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/3/2019. (kd) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Tue 12/18 3:22 PM
TEXT ORDER - Rescheduling a Telephone Conference from 1/16/2019 to 1/18/2019 at 2:30 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/18/2018. (kd) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
Fri 11/02 11:44 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee as to THOMAS J. YOO, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW037857 (dam, ) |
||
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/18 3:03 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/16/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Kevin McNulty. Fact Discovery due by 5/24/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/17/2018. (dam, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/10 3:25 PM
ORDER ADMITTING Thomas J. Yoo, ESQ. to appear PRO HAC VICE. etc. Re13 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/9/2018. (dam, ) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Fri 10/05 3:44 PM
Letter from Daniel K. Winters, addressed to The Hon. Leda D. Wettre re: Pro Hac Vice Admission for Thomas J. Yoo.(WINTERS, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Daniel K. Winters, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Thomas J. Yoo, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order of Thomas J. Yoo | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Fri 10/05 2:00 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order (Wave 3 Cases) by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION. (WINTERS, DANIEL) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/24 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLIN LOUISE STACHON on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION (STACHON, CAITLIN) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/11 6:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL K. WINTERS on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION (WINTERS, DANIEL) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
6
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/30 4:40 PM
ORDER consolidating the above-captioned actions for the purposes of coordinated pretrial discovery only, docketed as Civil Action Nos. 16-3083 16-3611 16-3211 16-3790 16-4279 16-2691 16-4159 16-3141 16-3566 16-3404 16-3610 and 16-3201 and the Clerk of the Court is directed to file a copy of this Order in each of the following cases; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 08/29/2018. (sms) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Tue 08/28 5:09 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Consent Order of Consolidation for Pretrial Discovery Purposes by All Defendants. (GEIST, MELISSA) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/15 6:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHANA EVE RUSSO on behalf of All Defendants(RUSSO, SHANA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/14 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. GEIST on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION(GEIST, MELISSA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 06/25 2:27 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kevin McNulty for all further proceedings. Judge Susan D. Wigenton no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/25/18. (ak, ) |
|
4 | 4
mdl
MDL Order of Remand (in)
Mon 06/25 11:47 AM
Order remanding MDL action from the Eastern District of Missouri; Case # 4:01241 to this court. (gh, ) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Fri 07/29 2:35 PM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri. (ek) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Fri 07/29 2:36 PM
Case extracted via ECF to the Eastern District of Missouri. (ek) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Mon 08/01 3:14 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Eastern District of Missouri as case 4:16-cv-01241, filed 07/29/2016. (mfr) |
||
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/18 12:13 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Susan Miller* (Miller, S) |
|
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/18 12:11 PM
COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7230042) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STACY MEYER.(Miller, S) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |