NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS et al v. LANE CONSTRUCTION
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Madeline C Arleo |
Referred: | Michael A Hammer |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-04298 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 10, 2017 4:14 AM EST |
Petitioner
NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
LANE CONSTRUCTION
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment
Tue 01/31 7:16 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF, NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, in the amount of $56,825.70 against LANE CONSTRUCTION ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 1/30/2017. (JB, ) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration
Tue 01/31 7:12 PM
ORDER Granting3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF, NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, that the Opinion and Award of 4/28/2016 shall and are hereby CONFIRMED. Signed by Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 1/30/2017. (JB, ) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Confirm or Vacate Arbitration
Mon 07/18 12:53 PM
MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF, NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS.(Miller, S) |
|
Att: 1 Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Statement, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/18 12:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF, NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS. (Miller, S) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration Award
Mon 07/18 12:49 PM
PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7227589.), filed by NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF.(Miller, S) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/18 12:56 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award. Motion set for 8/15/2016 before Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (Miller, S) |