Trustees Of The Operative Plasterers' and Cement Mason's International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds et al v. Dynamic Fireproofing, Corp.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-05712 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1131 ERISA - Collection of Delinquent Trust Fun |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 14, 2017 4:54 AM EST |
Defendant
Dynamic Fireproofing, Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees Of The Operative Plasterers' and Cement Mason's International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 11/16 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) Dynamic Fireproofing, Corp.. Document filed by Trustees Of The Operative Plasterers' and Cement Mason's International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds, Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262. (Lim, Thailary) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 11/04 1:07 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference scheduled for 11/22/2016 will begin at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (msa) |
||
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 10/24 12:24 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/22/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/21/2016) (cla) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/19 12:26 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dynamic Fireproofing, Corp.. (rch) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 07/19 12:29 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 07/19 12:29 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 07/19 12:30 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rch) |
||
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/18 3:29 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees Of The Operative Plasterers' and Cement Mason's International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds.(Lim, Thailary) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 07/18 3:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dynamic Fireproofing, Corp., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262, Trustees Of The Operative Plasterers' and Cement Mason's International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds. (Lim, Thailary) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 07/18 3:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lim, Thailary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/18 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Dynamic Fireproofing, Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12548461)Document filed by Trustees Of The Operative Plasterers' and Cement Mason's International Association Local 262 Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Pension Fund and Apprenticeship Training Funds, Operative Plasterers' and Cement Masons' International Association, Local 262.(Lim, Thailary) |