Hannaford Enterprises, LLC v. Robert R. Weakley et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lucy H Koh |
Referred: | Nathanael M Cousins |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-04048 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 14, 2017 2:00 AM PST |
Defendant
Indus Holding Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert R. Weakley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hannaford Enterprises, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 10/18 5:30 PM
STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Defendants Without Prejudice filed by Hannaford Enterprises, LLC. (Vick, Timothy) (Filed on 10/18/2016) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 10/12 6:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Rule 26 Report and CMC Statement filed by Hannaford Enterprises, LLC. (Vick, Timothy) (Filed on 10/12/2016) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR
Thu 10/06 11:13 AM
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 14 Stipulation selecting Private ADR.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
Wed 10/05 12:52 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Hannaford Enterprises, LLC filed by Hannaford Enterprises, LLC. (Vick, Timothy) (Filed on 10/5/2016) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Tue 10/04 3:41 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Vick, Timothy) (Filed on 10/4/2016) |
|
12 | 12
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice
Tue 10/04 2:04 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 10/04 1:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Hannaford Enterprises, LLC (Vick, Timothy) (Filed on 10/4/2016) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 09/26 4:11 PM
**CLERK'S NOTICE ADJUSTING THE START-TIME OF THE 10/19/16 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this Notice, the 10/19/2016 CMC is advanced to a 1:00PM start-time (from 2:00PM). The CMC date/location remains the same. (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (smsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016) |
|
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/09 2:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint byIndus Holding Company. (Ubhaus, Frank) (Filed on 9/9/2016) |
|
8 | 8
8
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/09 2:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint byRobert R. Weakley. (Swartz, Andrew) (Filed on 9/9/2016) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 08/17 11:35 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hannaford Enterprises, LLC re1 Complaint,5 Summons Issued,4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Vick, Timothy) (Filed on 8/17/2016) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/19 4:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Indus Holding Company. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/19 4:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Robert R. Weakley. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 07/19 4:50 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2016. Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2016 02:00 PM. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 07/19 3:49 PM
Case assigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/18 4:12 PM
Proposed Summons. (Vick, Timothy) (Filed on 7/18/2016) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/18 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10616176.). Filed byHannaford Enterprises, LLC.(Vick, Timothy) (Filed on 7/18/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |