Smith v. Anchorage Police Department et al
Alaska District Court | |
Judge: | Ralph R Beistline |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00154 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 10, 2017 12:06 AM AKST |
Defendant
Anchorage Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Brett E. Sarber
|
|
Defendant
Francis Stanfield
|
|
Defendant
Todd Summey
|
|
Defendant
D. Wilson
|
|
Plaintiff
Din Ogan Shango Smith
501236 Goose Creek Correctional Center PO BOX 877790
Wasilla, AK 99687 |
Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago |
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Tue 08/09 2:57 PM
JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/9/16. (JLH, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 08/09 11:30 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (CC: DQA). (Jan, Chambers Staff) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Additional Related Document
Mon 08/08 4:22 PM
ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT by Din Ogan Shango Smith re1 Complaint. (PXS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Unissued Summons
Mon 07/18 1:41 PM
Unissued summons re Defendants. (TYM, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/18 1:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Din Ogan Shango Smith.(TYM, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Account, | ||
Att: 2 2nd IFP | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 07/18 1:34 PM
Civil Cover Sheet. (TYM, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/18 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Anchorage Police Department, Brett E. Sarber, Francis Stanfield, Todd Summey, D. Wilson, filed by Din Ogan Shango Smith.(TYM, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 attachment |