PAVELKA v. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Susan D Wigenton |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-04378 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 15, 2017 4:19 AM EST |
Defendant
BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAYER OY
|
|
Defendant
BAYER PHARMA AG
|
|
Plaintiff
DANIELLA PAVELKA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Thu 04/20 3:09 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:17-cv-02854, filed 04/20/2017. (mfr) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Mon 04/10 1:37 PM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of New York. (ek) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Mon 04/10 1:38 PM
Case extracted via ECF to the Southern District of New York. (ek) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order
Mon 03/27 12:45 PM
ORDER granting31 Letter request for a Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joan R. Camagong, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 03/27/2017. (ek) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Letter
Fri 03/24 5:11 PM
Letter from Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joan R. Camagong, Esq. on consent of all parties.(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Joan R. Camagong, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joan R. Camagong, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Tue 03/14 5:11 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, AMIR NASSIHI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Tue 03/14 5:13 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ALICIA J. DONAHUE and DEBORAH A. MOELLER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, ) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Mon 03/13 5:03 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Deborah A. Moeller, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7706164.) (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Mon 03/13 5:02 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alicia J. Donahue, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7706155.) (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Mon 03/13 5:00 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Amir Nassihi, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7706150.) (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Letter
Tue 03/07 5:18 PM
Letter from Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lori C. McGroder, Esq. on consent of all parties.(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Lori C. McGroder, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lori C. McGroder, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Tue 03/07 11:48 AM
ORDER granting23 Letter request for a Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alicia J. Donahue, Esq., on consent of all parties, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 03/07/2017. (ek) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order
Tue 03/07 11:46 AM
ORDER granting22 Letter request for a Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amir Nassihi, Esq., on consent of all parties, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 03/07/2017. (ek) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order
Tue 03/07 11:44 AM
ORDER granting21 Letter request for a Pro Hac Vice Admission of Deborah A. Moeller, Esq., on consent of all parties, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 03/07/2017. (ek) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Mon 03/06 11:38 AM
Letter from Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alicia J. Donahue, Esq. on consent of all parties.(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Alicia J. Donahue, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alicia J. Donahue, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Mon 03/06 11:33 AM
Letter from Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amir Nassihi, Esq. on consent of all parties.(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Amir Nassihi, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amir Nassihi, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Mon 03/06 8:48 AM
Letter from Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Deborah A. Moeller, Esq. on consent of all parties.(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Deborah A. Moeller, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice admission of Deborah A. Moeller, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint)
Fri 02/10 3:22 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Amendment to5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Fri 01/27 12:45 PM
TEXT ORDER - The parties shall appear for a telephone status conference before Magistrate Judge Leda Dunn Wettre on 4/24/2017, at 3:00 PM. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call to (973) 645-3574 once representatives for all parties are on the line.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/27/2017. (kd) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 01/19 11:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 1/18/2017. (kd) |
||
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Thu 12/08 12:07 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Telephone Conference set for 12/12/2016 is adjourned with no new date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/8/2016. (kd) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Thu 12/08 9:59 AM
Letter from Defendants on behalf of all parties regarding status report. (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Thu 10/06 9:29 AM
TEXT ORDER - Counsel shall appear for a joint settlement conference as to the IIH cases against the Bayer defendants before Magistrate Judge Leda Dunn Wettre on 1/18/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 4A of the Martin Luther King Jr. Building & U.S. Courthouse. Clients with full and immediate settlement authority shall be available by telephone. Counsel shall submit, via email to LDW_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, confidential settlement-position statements no later than 11/12/2017.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/6/2016. (kd) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 09/12 4:49 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/12/2016 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre, Pltf's counsel to initiate the call. Any motions to Add New Parties or Amend Pleadings due by 10/28/2016. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 4/3/2017, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/9/16. (th, ) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 09/08 2:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/8/2016. (kd) |
||
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 08/30 4:02 PM
PROTOCOL FOR DOCUMENT FORMAT PRODUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/30/2016. (seb) |
|
13 | 13
order
Discovery Confidentiality Order
Tue 08/30 3:58 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/30/2016. (seb) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Fri 08/26 4:38 PM
Letter from Lorna A. Dotro, Esq. on behalf of all parties submitting Proposed Revised Protective Order.(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Lorna A. Dotro in Support of Application for a Protective Order | ||
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
discov
Joint Discovery Plan
Wed 08/24 3:06 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 08/24 9:15 AM
ORDER granting Thomas F. Dellafera, Jr., Esq., admission to appear pro hac vice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/23/2016. (seb) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Mon 08/22 5:13 PM
Letter from Heather K. D'Onofrio, Esquire requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas Dellafera, Esquire on consent of all parties.(D'ONOFRIO, HEATHER) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Heather K. D'Onofrio, Esquire; Certification of Thomas Dellafera, Jr., Esquire, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Thu 08/18 4:36 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the request for the Rule 16 Conferences scheduled for September 8, 2016 to be conducted via telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/18/2016. (seb) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Wed 08/17 12:10 PM
Letter from Louis F. D'Onofrio, Esq., on behalf of all counsel, requesting Rule 16 Conference be conducted via telephone. (D'ONOFRIO, LOUIS) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 08/15 2:21 PM
LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/8/2016 at 12:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/15/2016. (kd) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/12 2:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/12 2:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/02 11:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DANIELLA PAVELKA. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 7/25/2016, answer due 8/15/2016. (seb) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/19 3:00 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER OY, BAYER PHARMA AG Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Robin Newman* (rn, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/19 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT against BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER OY, BAYER PHARMA AG ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7235773) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DANIELLA PAVELKA.(rn, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |