Hawkins v. United States of America
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald C Nugent |
Case #: | 5:16-mc-00041 |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 18, 2016 5:33 AM EST |
Petitioner
Don Nell Hawkins
#53703-060 FCI - Hazelton P.O. Box 5000
Bruceton Mills, WV 26525 |
|
Respondent
United States of America
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 10/26 2:38 PM
True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: The appeal is dismissed, for want of prosecution re10 . The proper fee was not paid by 10/16/17 (USCA# 16-4217 . Date issued by USCA 10/25/17 (H,SP) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 08/31 12:03 PM
True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: The appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction re15 (USCA# 17-3683 . Circuit Judges: Rogers, Griffin, and Kethledge. Date issued by USCA 8/30/17 (H,SP) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
appeal
Acknowledgment from the USCA
Thu 06/29 4:11 PM
Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of15 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 17-3683 . Date filed in USCA 6/27/17. (H,SP) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 06/19 10:33 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the USCA for the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from 6 7 1714 Order denying motion for certificate of appealability filed by Don Nell Hawkins. Fee not paid. (C,KA) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for certificate of appealability
Wed 06/07 8:23 AM
Marginal Entry Order denying Petitioner's Motion for certificate of appealability as there is no basis to support this request. Signed by Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/6/2017.(S,SR) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Wed 06/07 8:24 AM
Copy of14 Order on Motion for certificate of appealability mailed to Don Nell Hawkins #53703-060 at FCI - Hazelton P.O. Box 5000 Bruceton Mills, WV 26525 on 6/7/2017. (S,SR) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Certificate of Appealability
Mon 06/05 3:17 PM
Motion for certificate of appealability filed by Petitioner Don Nell Hawkins. Related document(s)12 . (R,Sh) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
Appeal Remark
Tue 05/23 4:26 PM
Appeal Order from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Denying the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis re10 Notice of Appeal. Unless Hawkins pays the $505 filing fee to the district court within thirty days of the entry of this order, this appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution (USCA# 16-4217 . Date issued by USCA 5/23/17 (H,SP) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
Appeal Remark
Wed 11/23 12:08 PM
Appeal Remark: IFP Motion Returned to Appellant with Instructions to file with the Circuit Court re10 Notice of Appeal (H,SP) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
appeal
Acknowledgment from the USCA
Fri 10/28 10:35 AM
Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of10 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 16-4217 . Date filed in USCA 10/27/16. (H,SP) |
||
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 10/21 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the9 Order of 10/6/16, filed by Don Nell Hawkins. Filing fee not paid. (H,SP) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to alter/amend judgment
Thu 10/06 2:45 PM
Order denying petitioner's Motion to alter/amend judgment . The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this order could not be taken in good faith. Judge Donald C. Nugent 10/6/16(C,KA) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Thu 10/06 2:46 PM
Copy of Order on Motion to alter/amend judgment, mailed to Don Nell Hawkins #53703-060 USP - Hazelton P.O. Box 5000 Bruceton Mills, WV 26525. Related document(s)9 . (C,KA) |
||
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Fri 09/16 2:46 PM
Notice of Supplemental Authority Re: Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment filed by Don Nell Hawkins. Related document(s)7 .(R,Sh) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Alter/Amend judgment
Thu 09/15 2:52 PM
Motion to alter or amend judgment filed by Petitioner Don Nell Hawkins.(C,KA) |
|
Att: 1 6cr505 Order | ||
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Address Change Notice
Mon 09/12 1:44 PM
Address Change Notice filed by Don Nell Hawkins. (R,Sh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice
Mon 09/12 1:42 PM
Addendum to Motion for Independent Action Under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Don Nell Hawkins. Related document(s)1 .(R,Sh) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/30 1:20 PM
Order denying motion and dismissing case .The court certifies, pursuant to 28:1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith.Judge Donald C. Nugent 8/30/16 (C,KA) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 08/30 1:21 PM
Copy mailed to at Don Nell Hawkins #53703-060 USP - Hazelton P.O. Box 2000 Bruceton Mills, WV 26525. Related document(s)4 . (C,KA) |
||
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
trial
Exhibits
Fri 08/12 2:54 PM
Addendum to independent action in euity filed by Don Nell Hawkins. Related document(s)1 . (E,P) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/19 11:47 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Don Nell Hawkins. (M,TL) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Order
Tue 07/19 11:39 AM
Motion for Independent Action Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedures filed by Petitioner Don Nell Hawkins.(M,TL) |
|
Att: 1 17 pgs Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits 1-3 - Various Court Documents, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibits A - G Documents re Warrants and Recordings, | ||
Att: 4 Letter from Petitioner |