Werry v. Colvin
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Dean Whipple |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-05084 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Clerk's Judgment
Wed 04/26 3:06 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Enss, Rhonda) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order
Wed 04/26 11:25 AM
ORDER - The Commissioners final decision is AFFIRMED. Signed on 04/26/2017 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
soc_sec
Social Security reply brief by plaintiff
Fri 03/31 3:26 PM
PLAINTIFFS SOCIAL SECURITY REPLY BRIEF filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Marshall Werry, II.(Overton, Kathleen) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
soc_sec
Social Security brief by defendant
Fri 03/10 10:09 AM
DEFENDANTS SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin. Plaintiff social security reply brief due by 3/31/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Tue 02/07 1:56 PM
ORDER - Defendant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time (Doc.13 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file her social security brief on or before March 10, 2017. Signed on 02/07/2017 by District Judge Dean Whipple. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Tue 02/07 12:17 PM
Second MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines until March 10th to file Defendant's BRIEF filed byJeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/21/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Mon 01/09 2:41 PM
ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Doc.11 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file her social security brief on or before February 9, 2017. Signed on 01/09/2017 by District Judge Dean Whipple. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Mon 01/09 11:20 AM
First MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines up to and including February 9th to file Defendant's BRIEF filed byJeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/23/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
soc_sec
Social Security brief by plaintiff
Thu 12/01 4:59 PM
PLAINTIFFS SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Marshall Werry, II. Defendant social security brief due by 1/10/2017 unless service is made pursuant to FRCP 5 or as otherwise directed by the court.(Overton, Kathleen) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
ssanswer
Answer to Social Security complaint
Wed 10/19 2:34 PM
ANSWER to Social Security complaint filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin. Plaintiffs social security brief due by 12/1/2016 (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
8 | 8
soc_sec
Submission of administrative record
Wed 10/19 2:33 PM
SUBMISSION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin.(Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 001 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 002 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 006 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 007 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 008 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 009 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Wed 09/21 9:42 AM
ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Doc. [6)] is GRANTED. Defendant shall file her answer or other response to the complaint on or before October 20, 2016. Signed on 09/21/2016 by District Judge Dean Whipple. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Tue 09/20 10:48 AM
First MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines up to and including October 20, 2016, to file Defendant's ANSWER filed byJeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/7/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
soc_sec
Return of service of Social Security Complaint
Fri 09/02 4:43 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 7/22/2016 Social security answer due by 9/23/2016. Record of Submission due by 10/24/2016.(Overton, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Served: US Atty 7/22/16; Office of Regional Counsel 7/22/16; Atty General 8/2/16 | ||
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Letter of reassignment
Mon 07/25 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Robert E. Larsen to District Judge Dean Whipple. **The new case number is 16-cv-05084-SW-DW.** (Martin, Jan) |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Assignment
Wed 07/20 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for the parties. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 8/15/2016 (Siegert, Karen) |
||
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 07/20 1:00 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED and emailed to plaintiff's counsel for service as to Carolyn W. Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Siegert, Karen) |
||
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
sscmp
Complaint - Social Security
Tue 07/19 4:34 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Marshall Werry, II. (Filing fee $400 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Marshall Werry, II. Service due by 10/20/2016.(Overton, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/19 4:25 PM
ORDER granting1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 5/19/16 by Magistrate Judge Robert E. Larsen. (Wilson, Carol) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/19 4:01 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Marshall Werry, II. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/5/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Marshall Werry, II(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint |