Pamela Campell v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-01587 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2017 12:27 AM PST |
Defendant
DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
MESERVE, MUMPER & HUGHES LLP 800 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 500
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Campell
3257 East Guasti Road Suite 300
Ontario, CA 91761 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 09/29 12:32 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal GRANTING Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice11 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action, Case No. 5:16-CV-01587 JGB(KKx), is dismissed in its entirety as to all defendants, with prejudice. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs in this matter. (ad) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 09/26 2:19 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Chineduh, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 08/25 9:46 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In light of the Notice of Settlement filed August 24, 2016, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By September 23, 2016, the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of September 26, 2016. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (vp) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Settlement
Wed 08/24 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Pamela Campell. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 08/10 5:20 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (vp) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 08/08 4:02 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Fri 07/29 11:21 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:16-cv-01587 JGB(KKx). (rn) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Thu 07/28 8:44 AM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Pamela Campell. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Thu 07/21 2:28 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (esa) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C | ||
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 07/20 3:40 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attorney Nicole Y Blohm added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Blohm, Nicole) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 07/20 3:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Chineduh, Charles) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 07/20 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS 1609620 Receipt No: 0973-18218536 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attorney Charles Kelechi Chineduh added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Chineduh, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (State Documents), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Answer), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (State Removal), | ||
Att: 4 Declaration re Removal of Action to the United States District Court | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 07/21 2:20 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Life Insurance Company of North America, Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff Pamela Campell. (esa) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 07/21 2:23 PM
COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Pamela Campell, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 6/21/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 07/21 2:24 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(esa) |