JAN MARASEK AND JOAN BYRON MARASEK et al v. FOSSI
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Peter G Sheridan |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-04437 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 17, 2017 3:43 AM EST |
Appellant
JOAN BYRON MARASEK
P.O. BOX 101
CLARKSBURG, NJ 08510 |
|
Appellant
JAN MARASEK
P.O. BOX 101
CLARKSBURG, NJ 08510 |
|
Appellee
LINDA FOSSI, ESQ.
|
Represented By
|
In Re
JAN MARASEK AND JOAN BYRON MARASEK
|
|
Notice Only
bktre
|
|
Trustee
THEODORE J. LISCINSKI, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Tue 02/14 2:26 PM
Letter Notice of No Service from Joan Byron-Marasek & Jan Marasek. (km) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Mon 01/30 4:31 PM
ORDER that the Appellants' Brief is to be filed by 2/14/2017; any brief in opposition shall be filed by 2/21/2017. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/30/2017. (km) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Wed 01/25 2:24 PM
Letter Brief from Joan Byron Marasek and Jan Marasek.(km) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minutes
Miscellaneous Hearing
Wed 01/11 5:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 1/11/2017. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, ) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 01/11 4:50 PM
ORDER denying Appellant's1 appeal. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/11/2017. (mps) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
appeal
Designation of Record on Appeal (Bankruptcy)
Thu 07/21 4:33 PM
DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by JOAN BYRON MARASEK, JAN MARASEK re1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable PETER G. SHERIDAN, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 8/22/2016. (mps) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Thu 07/21 4:29 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-30919 filed by JOAN BYRON MARASEK, JAN MARASEK.(mps) |
|
Att: 1 Request Fee Waiver, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Transmittal | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 07/21 4:40 PM
Oral Argument Required: Bankruptcy Appeal set for 11/7/2016 11:00 AM before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mps) |
||
qc
QC - Updating Account
Thu 07/21 4:44 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal submitted by Jan Marasek and Joan Byron Marasek on 7/21/2016 appears to have address information as to Appellee's counsel Gary C. Zeitz, Esq. that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (mps) |