Catalyst Medium Four, Inc. v. Product Zone Group, Inc. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lee Yeakel |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00894 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 17, 2017 2:23 AM CST |
Defendant
Product Zone Group, Inc.
1504 Bay Road #1016
Miami Beach, FL 33139 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ovadia Shmuel, Sr.
1504 Bay Rd. #1016
Miami Beach, FL 33139 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shmuel Ovadia
|
|
Plaintiff
Catalyst Medium Four, Inc.
500 E. 4th Street Suite 122
Austin, TX 78701 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Report on Copyright (AO-121)
Wed 02/14 9:04 AM
Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (klw) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment
Thu 10/05 3:27 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jf) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 09/25 2:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Shmuel Ovadia with Prejudice by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc.. (Denko, J.) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 09/21 7:43 AM
ORDER, (Status Conference set for 10/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 09/20 1:59 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Shmuel Ovadia without Prejudice by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc.. (Denko, J.) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment under Rule 54(b)
Wed 09/20 8:03 AM
Joint Stipulated Final Money Judgment and Final Order for Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Product Zone Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Judgment under Rule 54(b)
Wed 09/13 4:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) and Final Order for Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Product Zone Group, Inc. by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc..(Denko, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Final Money Judgement and Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Product Zone Group, Inc. | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice
Mon 08/21 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Bankruptcy by Shmuel Ovadia, Product Zone Group, Inc., Ovadia Shmuel, Sr(Urban, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit BK Petition | ||
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/07 9:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 12/15/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2017, Discovery due by 3/16/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 3/3/2017, Motions due by 3/30/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel, followed by jury trial in October, 2018. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw) |
|
18 | 18
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Tue 03/07 8:01 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/6/2017. Settings announced. Written Order to follow. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(klw) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 03/03 5:48 PM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by Product Zone Group, Inc., Ovadia Shmuel, Sr.(Urban, Steven) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 02/17 3:59 PM
ORDER resetting Initial Pretrial Conference for 3/6/2017 02:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 01/03 11:39 AM
ORDER, ( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel,). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 11/23 6:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shmuel Ovadia, Product Zone Group, Inc. amending, filed by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc..(Denko, J.) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 11/23 9:42 AM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's12 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A to the motion for leave is not signed and therefore cannot be docketed by the clerk of court. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file its First Amended Complaint in compliance with the local rules. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 11/18 2:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AMEND CASE CAPTION by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc..(Denko, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - REDLINE of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Tue 11/15 1:36 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc.. (Denko, J.) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/15/2016) (klw) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 11/01 2:41 PM
Order GRANTING9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc.. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/15/2016. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 10/31 4:04 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc..(Denko, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 08/17 6:11 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Product Zone Group, Inc., Ovadia Shmuel, Sr. (Urban, Steven) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/15 4:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, . Attorney Steven Douglas Urban added to party Product Zone Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Urban added to party Ovadia Shmuel, Sr(pty:dft) by Product Zone Group, Inc., Ovadia Shmuel, Sr.(Urban, Steven) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/22 1:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Product Zone Group, Inc., Ovadia Shmuel, Sr. (afd) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Report on Copyright (AO-121)
Fri 07/22 12:56 PM
Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights with copy of Complaint. (afd) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Thu 07/21 6:26 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc.. (Denko, J.) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 07/21 5:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc.. (Denko, J.) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Thu 07/21 5:29 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc.. (Denko, J.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/21 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-8685437), filed by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc..(Denko, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/22 12:52 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 07/22 12:53 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Catalyst Medium Four, Inc.. (afd) |