JOHNSON v. BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Susan D Wigenton |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-04449 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 17, 2017 3:54 AM EST |
Defendant
BAYER OY
|
|
Defendant
BAYER PHARMA AG
|
|
Defendant
BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV TREVOR B ROCKSTAD
|
|
Plaintiff
ANDREA JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Thu 04/20 3:11 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:17-cv-02856, filed 04/20/2017. (mfr) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Mon 04/10 1:39 PM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of New York. (ek) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Mon 04/10 1:39 PM
Case extracted via ECF to the Southern District of New York. (ek) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Thu 04/06 9:48 AM
TEXT ORDER - The Scheduling Conference will go forward on 4/27/2017 at 11:30 am in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Judge Leda D. Wettre. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2017 is adjourned.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/6/2017. (kd) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Wed 04/05 12:29 PM
LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/26/2017 at 12:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/5/2017. (kd) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/03 3:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 02/14 4:42 PM
LETTER ORDER Granting Defendants' partial3 MOTION to Dismiss by BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Counts I, II, IV, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX, and X of the Complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/14/2017. (JB, ) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint)
Fri 02/10 3:40 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Amendment to4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 01/24 11:46 AM
ORDER terminating11 Motion to Stay. An in-person initial scheduling conference, shall be conducted before the undersigned on 4/27/2017 11:30am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/23/2017. (JB, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 01/19 11:30 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 1/18/2017. (kd) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stay
Tue 01/10 12:19 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by the JPML by ANDREA JOHNSON.(MUHLSTOCK, MELANIE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/10 4:00 PM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by the JPML . Motion set for 2/6/2017 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) |
||
Monday, October 10, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Mon 10/10 12:02 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Trevor B. Rockstad, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7403295.) (MUHLSTOCK, MELANIE) |
|
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Mon 10/10 9:08 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, TREVOR B ROCKSTAD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, ) |
||
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Thu 10/06 9:29 AM
TEXT ORDER - Counsel shall appear for a joint settlement conference as to the IIH cases against the Bayer defendants before Magistrate Judge Leda Dunn Wettre on 1/18/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 4A of the Martin Luther King Jr. Building & U.S. Courthouse. Clients with full and immediate settlement authority shall be available by telephone. Counsel shall submit, via email to LDW_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, confidential settlement-position statements no later than 11/12/2017.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/6/2016. (kd) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Mon 09/26 9:12 AM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re3 MOTION to Dismiss (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Mon 09/19 10:31 AM
ORDER Granting5 Letter from Melanie H. Muhlstock, Esq. requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Trevor B. Rockstad, Esq. on consent of all parties, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/16/2016. (JB, ) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
Thu 09/15 3:22 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ANDREA JOHNSON re3 MOTION to Dismiss (MUHLSTOCK, MELANIE) |
|
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Thu 09/15 1:22 PM
Letter from Melanie H. Muhlstock, Esq. requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Trevor B. Rockstad, Esq. on consent of all parties.(MUHLSTOCK, MELANIE) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Melanie H. Muhlstock, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice admission of Trevor B. Rockstad, Esq., | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Trevor B. Rockstad in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/09 12:31 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/3/2016 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) |
||
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 09/08 3:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Thu 09/08 3:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Responses due by 9/19/2016(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/22 2:46 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER OY, BAYER PHARMA AG, BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Donato Marucci* (dam) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/22 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against BAYER OY, BAYER PHARMA AG, BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7242453) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANDREA JOHNSON.(dam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |