Lisitsa v. Young
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer H Rearden |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-05903 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332lb Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 18, 2017 4:10 AM EST |
Defendant
John Bell Young
224 Western Ave
Brattleboro, VT 05301 |
|
Plaintiff
Valentina Lisitsa
2800 Old Cherry Point Road
New Bern, NC 28650 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Wed 02/21 8:30 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 44. Mailed to: John Bell Young c/o D. Cohen 224 Western Ave Brattleboro, VT 05301. (mt) |
||
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Stay Lifted
Tue 02/20 10:01 AM
Case Stay Lifted. (ama) |
||
Monday, February 19, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 02/20 10:04 AM
ORDER: Accordingly, "[n]o letter[s] having been sent in response to the court's order[s],... this case is hereby DISMISSED for failure to prosecute." Agostino v. Wells Fargo Clearing Servs., LLC, 20 Civ. 357 (CM) (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 23, 2023). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail this Order to the address on file for the pro se Defendant: John Bell Young, c/o D. Cohen, 224 Western Avenue, Brattleboro, VT 05301. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 2/19/2024) (ama) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Wed 06/14 10:58 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 43. Mailed to: John Bell Young c/o D. Cohen 224 Western Ave Brattleboro, VT 05301. (kh) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/13 6:04 PM
ORDER: By July 5, 2023, Plaintiff shall file a letter, on behalf of both parties, addressing (1) the status of the appointment of the administratrix for the deceased Defendant's estate, and (2)whether Plaintiff intends to continue prosecuting this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail this Order to the pro se Defendant, at the following address: John Bell Young, c/o D. Cohen, 224 Western Ave. Brattleboro, VT 05301. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 6/13/2023) (kv) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2023 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Thu 03/02 9:07 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 42. Mailed to: John Bell Young c/o D. Cohen 224 Western Ave Brattleboro, VT 05301. (kh) |
||
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
42 | 42
21
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/01 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to this Court. All counsel and pro se parties must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jennifer-h-rearden, including the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Pro Se Cases. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the cases reassignment. Any conference or oral argument before or directed by the Magistrate Judge will proceed as ordered. However, all previously scheduled appearances or conferences before the District Judge are hereby adjourned pending further notice from the Court. Within three weeks of the filing of this Order, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint letter updating the Court on the status of the case. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) double-spaced pages, and shall provide the following information, to the extent it is relevant, in separate paragraphs: (As further set forth herein.) The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail this Order, along with Judge Rearden's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases and Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Pro Se Cases, to pro se Defendant. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 3/1/2023) (va) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 02/24 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Judge Loretta A. Preska is no longer assigned to the case. (nb) |
||
Wednesday, September 07, 2022 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Wed 09/07 11:07 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 41. Mailed to: John Bell Young c/o D. Cohen 224 Western Ave Brattleboro, VT 05301. (kh) |
||
Tuesday, September 06, 2022 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/06 5:50 PM
ORDER: Counsel shall confer and inform Judge Preska by letter no later than September 13, 2022, of the status of the appointment of the administratrix for the deceased Defendant's estate. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/6/2022) (vfr) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order
Wed 07/05 3:06 PM
ORDER: In light of Defendant's death noted in the attached documents, Plaintiff shall inform the Court whether there is any reason not to dismiss the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/5/2017) (anc) (Main Document 38 replaced on 7/5/2017) (anc) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order
Wed 03/22 4:07 PM
ORDER. In light of Plaintiff's denial under oath that she took or caused any of the actions Defendant complains of, and the fact that Defendant's home/surrogate address is on the public docket, and there is no evidence in the record of any plausible threat to Defendant, Defendant's request for a protective order is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/22/2017) (rjm) |
|
36 | 36
order
Order
Wed 03/22 3:24 PM
ORDER. Due to clerical errors in the March 10 order [dkt no. 35], the Court withdraws the March 10 Order. The Court instructs the docket clerk that the March 10 Order shall be stricken from the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/22/2017) (rjm) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order
Fri 03/10 4:55 PM
ORDER re:30 Letter, filed by John Bell Young: In light of Plaintiff's denial under oath that she took or caused any of the actions Defendant complains of, and the fact that Plaintiff's home/surrogate address is on the public docket, and there is no evidence in the record of any plausible threat to Plaintiff, Plaintiff's request for a protective order is denied. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/10/2017) (jwh) |
|
misc
Note Regarding Stricken Document
Wed 03/22 3:27 PM
***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 35 (in its entirety) from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to 36 Order. (rjm) |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Letter
Fri 03/10 11:56 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from John Bell Young dated 3/7/2017 re: Renewal of Request for Protective Order. Document filed by John Bell Young.(sac) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Letter
Mon 02/13 5:24 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Theodor D. E. Bruening dated 02/13/2017 re: Plaintiff's response to defendant's application for a protective order. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Theodor D.E. Bruening, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Valentina Lisitsa | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Wed 02/01 12:02 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's request for a protective order, [Dkt. no. 30] no later than February 15, 2017. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2017) (cf) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
4
pgs
misc
Letter
Mon 01/30 12:36 PM
LETTER (E-Mail) addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from John Bell Young dated 10/26/16 re: I am writing to bring your attention to a matter of urgency with regard to the defamation lawsuit being brought against me by Valentina Lisitsa, a public figure. I am representing myself, pro se. Document filed by John Bell Young. (mro) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Letter
Fri 11/18 4:01 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Richard G. Menaker dated 11/18/2016 re: Request for Oral Argument on the Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Tue 11/01 5:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Richard G. Menaker in Opposition re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa. (Menaker, Richard) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Letter
Tue 11/01 5:52 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Richard G. Menaker dated 11/01/2016 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/31 6:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Richard G. Menaker in Opposition re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Part 1 - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A Part 2 - Complaint Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. A Part 3 - Complaint Exhibit B Part 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. A Part 4 - Complaint Exhibit B Part 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. A Part 5 - Complaint Exhibit B Part 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. B Part 1, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. B Part 2, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. B Part 3, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. B Part 4, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. B Part 5, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. C, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. D, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. E, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex. F Part 1, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex. F Part 2, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Ex. F Part 3, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Ex. F Part 4, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Ex. G, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Ex. H, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Ex. I, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Ex. J, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit Ex. K, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit Ex. L, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit Ex. M, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Ex. N, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Ex. O, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit Ex. P, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit Ex. Q, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit Ex. R, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit Ex. S, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit Ex. T, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit Ex. U | ||
25 | 25
23
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/31 6:29 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. . Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa. (Menaker, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Memo Endorsement
Tue 10/25 12:17 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:23 Declaration filed by Valentina Lisitsa. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Young shall respond to the attached no later than November 4, 2016. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/24/2016) (kl) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Declaration (non-motion)
Wed 10/19 1:29 PM
DECLARATION of Cheryl L. Davis re:22 Letter to Judge Preska . Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa. (Menaker, Richard) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Wed 10/19 1:26 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Cheryl L. Davis dated 10/19/2016 re: Declaration requesting an order to enjoin defendant from publishing certain defamatory statements. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Wed 10/12 5:50 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Theodor Bruening dated 10/12/2016 re: Summary of Calls between Parties Regarding Discovery. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Discovery Schedule | ||
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 10/14 11:07 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(sac) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Mon 10/03 5:28 PM
CORRECTED ORDER: In response to Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order, a conference call was held on October 3 among Plaintiff's counsel, Mr. Young, and the Court. During the conference, Mr. Young agreed that he will not issue threats to Plaintiff's life or incite violence against her. The Court cautioned Mr. Young that failure to abide by the order might result in sanctions. This disposes of docket no. 13. Mr. Young informed counsel and the Court that he had mailed an answer to the complaint. Counsel and Mr. Young agreed to confer within a week about discovery, and counsel agreed to send Mr. Young and the Court a summary of that conversation. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/3/2016) (kl) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for TRO
Mon 10/03 3:24 PM
ORDER terminating13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; terminating13 Motion for TRO. In response to Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order, a conference call was held on October 3 among Plaintiff's counsel, Mr. Young, and the Court. During the conference, Mr. Young agreed that he will not issue threats to Plaintiff's life or incite violence against her. The Court cautioned Mr. Young that failure to abide by the order might result in sanctions. This disposes of docket no. 13. Mr. Young informed counsel and the Court that he had mailed an answer to the complaint. Counsel and Mr. Young agreed to confer within a week about discovery, and counsel agreed to send Mr. Young and the Court a summary of that conversation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/30/2016) (kl) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 10/05 10:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 10/3/2016. (mph) |
||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 09/30 6:06 PM
ORDER: A conference via telephone regarding the Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction and application for temporary restraining order will be held Monday, October 3, 2016 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for notifying the Defendant or the Defendant's counsel and establishing the teleconference by calling chambers. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 10/3/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/30/2016) (kl) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 09/28 5:23 PM
DECLARATION of Valentina Lisitsa in Support re:13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 4) to Lisitsa Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 4) to Lisitsa Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 4) to Lisitsa Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 4) to Lisitsa Declaration | ||
15 | 15
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 09/28 4:33 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa. (Menaker, Richard) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 09/28 4:25 PM
DECLARATION of Theodor D.E. Bruening in Support re:13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint [Trial by Jury Demanded], | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit New York Post Article, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Facebook Exchange with Defendant, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Facebook Exchange with Defendant, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex Parte Order for Service by Alternative Means, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Facebook Exchange with Defendant, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Docket Sheet | ||
13 | 13
motion
Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order
Wed 09/28 4:03 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ., MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service Complaints
Fri 09/02 9:43 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. John Bell Young served on 9/1/2016, answer due 9/22/2016. Service was accepted by John Bell Young. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Acknowledgement of Service by Defendant | ||
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Serve
Thu 09/01 4:01 PM
EX PARTE ORDER UNDER FRCP 4(e)(1) AND CPLR 308(5) FOR SERVICE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS granting8 Motion to Serve. It is hereby ORDERED, pursuant to Rule 4(e)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, that, in addition to service of the summons and complaint upon the defendant in the manner directed by Section 308(4) of the New York Civil Practice Law and Rules, the delivery of an electronic copy of such summons and complaint together with an electronic copy of this order by private online message from plaintiff's attorneys' Facebook account to defendant's Facebook account, repeated once a week for three consecutive weeks or until acknowledged by the defendant, shall constitute good and sufficient service. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/1/2016) (kl) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 08/30 4:16 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:8 EX PARTE MOTION to Serve Defendant . John Bell Young . Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa. (Menaker, Richard) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Tue 08/30 4:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Richard G. Menaker in Support re:8 EX PARTE MOTION to Serve Defendant .. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint (with Exhibits to the complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint (with Exhibits to the complaint), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint (with Exhibits to the complaint), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons and Complaint (with Exhibits to the complaint), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service and Correspondence, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service and Correspondence, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit New York Post Article, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Online Post, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Social Media Post, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Correspondence on Facebook, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Correspondence on Facebook, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Social Media Post, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Affidavit of Service | ||
8 | 8
motion
Serve
Tue 08/30 4:07 PM
EX PARTE MOTION to Serve Defendant . Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
Thu 08/25 10:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Richard Glen Menaker to RE-FILE Document 5 EX PARTE MOTION to Serve Defendant. Use the event type Affidavit in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINDER*** - Motion to Serve WAS NOT FILED. First file Motion, then file and link any supporting documents. (db) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
Thu 08/25 10:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Richard Glen Menaker to RE-FILE Document 6 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document(s) linked to filing error(s). (db) |
||
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Tue 08/16 6:14 PM
EX PARTE LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Richard G. Menaker dated 08/16/2016 re: Ex Parte Motion to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means, Attaching Proposed Order. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 08/16 5:31 PM
EX PARTE MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:5 EX PARTE MOTION to Serve Defendant . . Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa. (Menaker, Richard) |
|
5 | 5
5
pgs
motion
Serve
Tue 08/16 5:24 PM
EX PARTE MOTION to Serve Defendant . Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1A: Summons and Complaint (with Exhibits to the complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 1B: Summons and Complaint (with Exhibits to the complaint), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 1C: Summons and Complaint (with Exhibits to the complaint), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 1D: Summons and Complaint (with Exhibits to the complaint), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 2: Affidavit of Attempted Service and Correspondence, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 3: Affidavit of Attempted Service and Correspondence, | ||
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit Ex. 4: New York Post Article, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 5: Online Post, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 6: Social Media Post, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. 7: Correspondence on Facebook, | ||
Att: 11 3 pgs Exhibit Ex. 8: Correspondence on Facebook, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. 9: Social Media Post, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. 10: Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/26 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT against John Bell Young. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Corrected Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit B, Part 1 to Corrected Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit B, Part 2 to Corrected Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit B, Part 3 to Corrected Complaint | ||
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/25 1:40 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Bell Young. (pc) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 07/25 11:32 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Bell Young, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 07/25 11:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Glen Menaker. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 07/25 1:34 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 07/25 1:35 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 07/25 1:35 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 07/25 1:37 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard Glen Menaker. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pc) |
||
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/22 6:12 PM
COMPLAINT against John Bell Young. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12570083)Document filed by Valentina Lisitsa.(Menaker, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 21 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 30 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 3 |