Reynolds Consumer Products LLC et al v. Glencore AG et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-05955 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade) |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Sep 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 22, 2017 4:13 AM EST |
Defendant
Glencore AG
|
|
Defendant
Glencore International AG
|
|
Defendant
Pacorini Vlissingen BV
|
|
Defendant
Metro International Trade Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MITSI Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JP Morgan Securities PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J. Aron & Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Henry Bath LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goldman Sachs International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goldman Sachs & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Glencore, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Access World (USA) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reynolds Consumer Products LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Southwire Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
244 | 244
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/02 2:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW granting (1396 in case 1:13-md-02481-PAE) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Henry B. Liu is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants Henry Bath LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., and JP Morgan Securities plc in this action. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to remove Mr. Liu from the docket and from the service list in this action. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/1/2023) (vfr) |