New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:16-cv-05985
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2016
Last checked: Monday Jan 23, 2017 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Matthew F. Cooper
Represented By
Michael Adam Berg
Office Of The Attorney General, New York State
contact info
Defendant
Honorable Matthew F. Cooper
Supreme Court New York County 60 Centre Street, Room 212
New York, NY 10007
Plaintiff
Anthony Zappin
1827 Washington Blvd.
Huntington, WV 25701
Represented By
Anthony Jacob Zappin
Latham & Watkins Llp (ny)
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/21/2017 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 12, 2017
52 52 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 6:33 PM
ORDER denying50 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court is in receipt of the parties' correspondences concerning Plaintiff's application to file a sur-reply. (See Dkt. 50-51). The Court is not persuaded that Plaintiff's sur-reply is necessary or appropriate. Accordingly, Plaintiff's application is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/12/2017) (ras)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
50 50 motion Leave to File Document Thu 11:15 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Anthony Zappin dated June 8, 2017. Document filed by Anthony Zappin.(Zappin, Anthony)
Related: [-]