Bauer v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia G Cooke |
Referred: | Edwin G Torres |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-23235 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 23, 2017 3:55 AM EST |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Mr. Charles Tetunic
Upchurch Watson White & Max Mediation Group 900 S. Pine Island Road Suite # 410
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Plaintiff
Connie Bauer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 12/28 11:51 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Closing Case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/28/2016. (tm) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 12/22 4:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Connie Bauer(Pena, Victor) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
adr
Notice of Mediator Selection (Optional Hearing)
Fri 09/30 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Charles Tetunic selected. Filed/Added by Connie Bauer, Charles Tetunic. (Pena, Victor) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/21 11:11 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Other Affiliate Connecticut General Corporation, a Connecticuit Corporation, Other Affiliate Cigna Holdings, Inc., a Delaware corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America (Gerson, Shari) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation
Tue 09/20 10:35 AM
ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: ( Bench Trial set for 7/24/2017 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Calendar Call set for 7/19/2017 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Amended Pleadings due by 11/11/2016., Expert Discovery due by 2/13/2017., Fact Discovery due by 11/18/2017., Joinder of Parties due by 11/11/2016., Final proposed jury instructions and verdict form Deadline 7/14/2017., In Limine Motions due by 6/15/2017., Dispositive Motions due by 4/6/2017., Daubert and Markman Motions due by 3/31/2017., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/15/2017.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/20/2016. (tm) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 09/19 3:23 PM
Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Connie Bauer (Pena, Victor) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Mon 09/19 3:18 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Connie Bauer(Pena, Victor) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 09/07 12:28 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney Shari Lyn Gerson added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft). (Gerson, Shari) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 08/29 9:29 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Connie Bauer. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/17/2016, answer due 9/7/2016. (Pena, Victor) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 08/08 11:37 AM
ORDER EXPEDITING SERVICE, (Expedited Service Deadline 10/7/2016.) Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/8/2016. (tm) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Mon 08/08 11:36 AM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/8/2016. (tm) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Referring Case to Judge
Mon 08/08 11:35 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/8/2016. (tm) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/28 8:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (bb) |
|
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Thu 07/28 8:09 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (bb) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Thu 07/28 8:09 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (bb) |
|
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8953234, filed by Connie Bauer.(Pena, Victor) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |