Curtis v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-23250 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 24, 2017 4:29 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jerame Curtis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerame Curtis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 12/09 10:41 AM
ENDORSED ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the Parties' joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 12/08 5:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint, With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America(Colombo, Sherril) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Notice of Court Practice Administrative Order
Mon 11/28 3:29 PM
Notice of Court Practice re Notice of Settlement, Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 11/28 2:07 PM
Joint NOTICE of Settlement by Jerame Curtis (Pena, Victor) Modified title text on 11/28/2016 (asl) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Thu 10/13 2:47 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Jerame Curtis(Pena, Victor) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 10/11 10:06 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
Monday, October 10, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 10/10 4:55 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report and Proposed Scheduling Order re11 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, by Life Insurance Company of North America. Responses due by 10/27/2016(Colombo, Sherril) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Thu 09/22 11:11 AM
ENDORSED ORDER Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1, on or before October 5,2016 , the parties shall prepare and file (1) a joint scheduling report and (2) a proposed scheduling order adhering to the format and guidance of the attached sample. The parties shall also file Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. The parties shall e-mail a copy of their proposed scheduling order in Word format to gayles@flsd.uscourts.gov. Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 09/16 1:40 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against Jerame Curtis by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Colombo, Sherril) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 09/15 10:09 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 09/14 5:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney Sherril May Colombo added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft).(Colombo, Sherril) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 09/06 2:18 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
Saturday, September 03, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Sat 09/03 12:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney Lindsay Marie Alter added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft).(Alter, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 08/25 12:00 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Jerame Curtis. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/17/2016, answer due 9/7/2016. (Pena, Victor) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/28 3:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (jua) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Thu 07/28 3:54 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (jua) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Thu 07/28 3:54 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jua) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/28 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8956411, filed by Jerame Curtis.(Pena, Victor) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A |