PC Puerto Rico, LLC v. Nolla-Olmo
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel R Dominguez |
Referred: | Marcos E Lopez |
Case #: | 3:13-cv-01320 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 06, 2015 7:30 AM AST |
Defendant
ABC Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Mohammed Yacoub Husmi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yacoub Husmi Yacoub
Urb. Villa Fontana 2XR-91 Via Donatella
Carolina, PR 00983 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PC Puerto Rico, LLC
P.O. Box 9023596
San Juan, PR 00902 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Carlos A. Nolla-Olmo
Terminated: 12/13/2013
PO BOX 540
Arecibo, PR 00613 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/11/2013 9:23 PM AST |