Florek v. Zell
South Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Karen E Schreier |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-04109 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 10/12 4:12 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Jesse Lyle Florek. Fee Amount: $63.82, Receipt No.: #SDX400048264. (SLW) |
||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 08/10 11:28 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Jesse Lyle Florek. Fee Amount: $50.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400047695. (JLS) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 06/08 3:05 PM
PARTIAL Filing Fee Received from Jesse Lyle Florek. Fee Amount: $25.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400047135. (JLS) |
||
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 05/11 3:13 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Jesse Lyle Florek. Fee Amount: $25, Receipt No.: #SDX400046882. (SLW) |
||
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 04/13 2:27 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Jesse Lyle Florek. Fee Amount: $25.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400046595. (JLS) |
||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 03/09 1:54 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Jesse Lyle Florek. Fee Amount: $50, Receipt No.: #SDX400046265. (SLW) |
||
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 01/12 2:50 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Jesse Lyle Florek. Fee Amount: $50.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400045746. (JLS) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 11/14 11:28 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Jesse Lyle Florek. Fee Amount: $25.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400045190. (JLS) |
||
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Mon 08/15 1:30 PM
JUDGMENT Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/15/16. (SLW) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/15 1:29 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing Case. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/15/16. (SLW) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter Sent
Fri 07/29 3:21 PM
New Case LETTER with enclosed copy of the docket sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Jesse Lyle Florek. (JLS) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Account Report
Fri 07/29 3:19 PM
PRISONER Trust Account Report. (JLS) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/29 3:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse Lyle Florek. (JLS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)
Fri 07/29 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand, filed by Jesse Lyle Florek. (JLS) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Case 12-918 - copy of Permanent Writ of Habeas Corpus, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Case 12-918 - copy of Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope Postmarked 7-26-16 |