New Mexico Health Connections v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | James O Browning |
Referred: | Jerry H Ritter |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00878 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Feb 24, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 24, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 25, 2017 2:50 AM MST |
Defendant
Sylvia Mathews Burwell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrew M. Slavitt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New Mexico Health Connections
|
Represented By
|
1. | NM Health Connections files lawsuit against two federal departments (KOB.com) |
Submitted Wed 08/03/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 24, 2020 | ||
101 | 101 1 pgs FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv) | |
100 | 100 2 pgs ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting97 Motion to Alter Judgment (vv) |