Vanhorn v. Equifax Information Systems, LLC
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Janet T Neff |
Referred: | Ellen S Carmody |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00969 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2017 4:16 AM EST |
defendant
Equifax Information Systems, LLC
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Lisa M. Vanhorn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/29 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff Lisa M. Vanhorn |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Regarding Dismissal Papers
Tue 09/13 11:12 AM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed by 10/7/2016; cancelling 10/12/2016 scheduling conference; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Settlement
Tue 09/13 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
Wed 08/31 1:11 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/12/2016 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; the attorneys handling the matter for trial are required to appear; joint status report due by 10/5/2016; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/30 2:49 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Systems, LLC (Bolton, Jordan) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/30 2:48 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Equifax Information Systems, LLC (Bolton, Jordan) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/12 1:09 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Equifax Information Systems, LLC served on 8/8/2016, answer due 8/29/2016 |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt | ||
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/02 9:28 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Equifax Information Systems, LLC (mg) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Tue 08/02 9:25 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons (to be issued)
Mon 08/01 1:53 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/01 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Equifax Information Systems, LLC filed by Lisa M Vanhorn |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Mon 08/01 1:49 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Lisa M Vanhorn in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-3609013 |