Narrative Ark Entertainment LLC v. Archie Comic Publications, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vincent L Briccetti |
Referred: | Lisa Margaret Smith |
Case #: | 7:16-cv-06109 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2017 5:11 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Archie Comic Publications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Narrative Ark Entertainment LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archie Comic Publications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sega of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Narrative Ark Entertainment LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Scott D. Fulop
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Archie Comic Publications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
misc
Sealed Document Disposed
Thu 08/04 9:37 AM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 146 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 8/3/22.(fk) |