Tindle v. Trans Union,LLC et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Julie A Robinson |
Referred: | Gerald L Rushfelt |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02540 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2017 4:04 AM CST |
Defendant
Berlin-Wheeler, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leilani Lynn Tindle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 02/21 3:42 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per 14 Stipulation of Dismissal.(hl) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 02/17 11:01 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Leilani Lynn Tindle. (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 10/24 8:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 4/28/2017. Dispositive motion deadline 6/2/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/27/2017. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before District Judge Julie A. Robinson, estimated trial time 4 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2017 at 02:15 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 10/24/2016. (hl) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 10/19 12:05 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/18/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (yh) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 10/18 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT with Defendant Trans Union, LLC only by Leilani Lynn Tindle (Rapp, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/04 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Trans Union, LLC. (Mouber, Bryan) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 10/04 2:21 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Berlin-Wheeler, Inc. (Hutnick, Benjamin) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/04 10:18 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Leilani Lynn Tindle. (Rapp, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Setting Scheduling Conference
Fri 08/26 1:15 PM
INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2016 at 11:15 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/4/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 8/26/2016. (hl) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/08 5:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Mouber, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 08/02 10:24 AM
DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Leilani Lynn Tindle. (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Designation of Place of Trial
Mon 08/01 3:21 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Mouber, Bryan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/01 3:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Mouber, Bryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 08/01 3:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Mouber, Bryan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 08/01 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, KS, case number 2016-LM-002725 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-3908922.), filed by Trans Union LLC.(Mouber, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Tue 08/02 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Van Ness, Charles) |