Avnet, Inc. v. Coda Global, LLC et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lee Yeakel |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00923 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 12:1441(a) Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2017 4:03 AM CST |
Defendant
Coda Global, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justin Martin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael O'Reilly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Troy Vetter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Avnet, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Tue 11/08 12:42 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT and Agreed Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 11/04 4:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Avnet, Inc..(Jamison, Crystal) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 05, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Thu 10/06 9:32 AM
ORDER that the parties shall file a motion to dismiss, stipulation of dismissal, or agreed order of dismissal on or before 11/04/16. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 10/04 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Avnet, Inc. (Katz, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice
Wed 08/24 5:24 PM
NOTICE by Avnet, Inc. (Jamison, Crystal) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/19 12:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion for Steven Collis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/19 12:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING Agreed10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 08/16 9:31 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Attachment,5 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Expedite ,6 Deficiency Notice, by Coda Global, LLC, Justin Martin, Michael O'Reilly, Troy Vetter.(Crouch, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 08/16 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda N. Crouch on behalf of Coda Global, LLC, Justin Martin, Michael O'Reilly, Troy Vetter (Crouch, Amanda) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/16 5:27 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda N. Crouch ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8761534) by on behalf of Coda Global, LLC, Justin Martin, Michael O'Reilly, Troy Vetter.(Crouch, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Admission | ||
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Attachment
Fri 08/05 8:56 AM
ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to5 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Expedite by Avnet, Inc.. (Katz, Marc) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Deficiency Notice
Fri 08/05 7:57 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Marc Katz: re 5 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Expedite. Proposed Orders are Required when a non-dispositive Motion is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please, file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "ATTACHMENT" event from the menu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Motion. In the Docket Text, type "(Proposed Order)". (klw) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Discovery Expedite
Thu 08/04 4:54 PM
MOTION for Discovery , MOTION to Expedite by Avnet, Inc..(Katz, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/02 6:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Coda Global, LLC, Justin Martin, Michael O'Reilly, Troy Vetter. (afd) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Supplement
Tue 08/02 11:54 AM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint by Avnet, Inc..(Katz, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F | ||
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 08/01 8:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Avnet, Inc.. (Katz, Marc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/01 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-8713178). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Avnet, Inc..(Katz, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 08/02 4:31 PM
Case Assignment to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (so) |