Daum Global Holdings Corp. v. Ybrant Digital Limited et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Alison J Nathan |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-03135 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 09:207 Application for order confirming award of arbitrators |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2013 |
Re-opened: | Jan 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 05, 2015 5:25 AM EST |
Petitioner
Daum Global Holdings Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
LGS Global Limited
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ybrant Digital Limited
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ybrant Media Acquisition, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |